EP1558412 - APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING A METALLIC SLURRY MATERIAL FOR USE IN SEMI-SOLID FORMING OF SHAPED PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRUNSWICK CORPORATION 1 North Field Court Lake Forest Illinois 60045-4811 / US | [2008/52] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states BRUNSWICK CORPORATION 1 North Field Court Lake Forest, Illinois 60045-4811 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOMBARD, Patrick, J. 7636 Local Hillsboro Road Cedar Hill, MO 63016 / US | 02 /
WANG, Shaupoh 104 Brighthurst Drive Chesterfield, MO 63005 / US | 03 /
WINTERBOTTOM, Walter, L. 100 Watlington Road Jackson, TN 38301 / US | 04 /
SPILLER, George 109 Warwick Way SE Rome, GA 30161 / US | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Every, David Aidan Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Every, David Aidan MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 03749394.7 | 02.09.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003US27660 | Priority number, date | US20020234008 | 03.09.2002 Original published format: US 234008 | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004022268 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1558412 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1558412 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B22D1/00 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
B22D17/007 (EP,US);
C22C1/12 (EP,US);
B22D41/01 (EP,US);
F27D19/00 (EP,US);
F27D9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METALLSCHLAMM ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER HALBFESTEN FORMUNG VON FORMTEILEN | [2005/31] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING A METALLIC SLURRY MATERIAL FOR USE IN SEMI-SOLID FORMING OF SHAPED PARTS | [2005/31] | French: | APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION D'UNE MATIERE DE PATE METALLIQUE DESTINEE A ETRE UTILISEE POUR FORMER DES PARTIES FA ONNEES DE TYPE SEMI-SOLIDE | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.12.2008 | BE | 24.12.2008 | CY | 24.12.2008 | CZ | 24.12.2008 | DK | 24.12.2008 | EE | 24.12.2008 | FI | 24.12.2008 | IT | 24.12.2008 | NL | 24.12.2008 | RO | 24.12.2008 | SI | 24.12.2008 | SK | 24.12.2008 | TR | 24.12.2008 | BG | 24.03.2009 | SE | 24.03.2009 | GR | 25.03.2009 | ES | 04.04.2009 | PT | 25.05.2009 | HU | 25.06.2009 | IE | 02.09.2009 | LU | 02.09.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
HU | 25.06.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LU | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LU | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 24.12.2008 | |
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5164148 (KAWASAKI MICHIO [JP]) [A] 1-43* column 4, line 23 - column 7, line 15; figures 1-17 *; | [A]WO0191944 (AEMP CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-43 * figures 1-12.; claims 1-50 * | International search | [A]US5539183 (BECKLEY JOHN P [US]); | [A]US6196294 (OHNSMANN GUSTAV [DE], et al); | [A]US6258315 (ARAKI TSUNEO [JP], et al) |