EP1542592 - DUAL ACTION ASPIRATION BIOPSY NEEDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDICAL DEVICE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3600 S.W. 47th Avenue Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | [2008/05] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Biopsy Sciences, Llc. 300 Spottis Woode Court Clearwater, FL 33756 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISHER, John, S. 310 Palmetto Road Belleair, FL 33756 / US | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR P.O. Box 102605 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/25] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Anwaltssozietät, Meissner, Bolte & Partner, Depotstrasse 5 1/2 86199 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03749737.7 | 17.09.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003US29260 | Priority number, date | US20020065155 | 23.09.2002 Original published format: US 65155 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004026142 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542592 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
A61B10/0266 (EP,US);
A61B10/0275 (EP,US);
A61B10/0283 (EP,US);
A61B10/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELTWIRKENDE ASPIRATIONS/BIOPSIE-NADEL | [2005/25] | English: | DUAL ACTION ASPIRATION BIOPSY NEEDLE | [2005/25] | French: | AIGUILLE DE BIOPSIE PAR ASPIRATION A DOUBLE ACTION | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 16.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 09.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2255282 (AL SAM SALAM ZAHROON) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]US5615690 (GIURTINO JOEL F [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract *; | [A]EP1132049 (ANGIODYNAMICS INC [US]) [A] 1-30 * abstract *; | [A]DE10032007 (GEUDER AG [DE]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2005046486 (SHIDHAM VINOD B [US], et al) [E] 1-30* paragraph [0053]; figures 11-13 * | International search | [X]US4903709 (SKINNER BRUCE A J [CA]); | [X]US5031634 (SIMON MORRIS [US]); | [X]US5320110 (WANG KO P [US]); | [A]US5458112 (WEAVER GEORGE W [US]); | [AE]US6656132 (OUCHI TERUO [JP]) | Examination | DE3026657 |