EP1546373 - METHODS FOR MEASURING RATES OF REVERSE CHOLESTEROL TRANSPORT IN VIVO, AS AN INDEX OF ANTI-ATHEROGENESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/26] | METHODS FOR MEASURING RATES OF RESERVE CHOLESTEROL TRANSPORT IN VIVO, AS AN INDEX OF ANTI-ATHEROGENESIS | ||
[2008/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLERSTEIN, Marc, K. 4 Anson Way Kensington, CA 94708 / US | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Holmberg-Schwindt, Tor Martin, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Holmberg, Martin, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03749756.7 | 15.09.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003US29361 | Priority number, date | US20020410352P | 13.09.2002 Original published format: US 410352 P | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004025270 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1546373 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1546373 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/60, C12Q1/00, G01N31/00, G01N33/92, A61K51/00, A61M36/14, A61K49/00, A61K51/04, A61K51/12, G01N33/60 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
A61K49/0004 (EP,US);
A61K51/04 (EP,US);
A61K51/0493 (EP,US);
A61K51/1224 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/26] | C12Q1/60, C12Q1/00, G01N31/00, G01N33/92, A61K51/00, A61M36/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER GESCHWINDIGKEITEN DES CHOLESTERINRÜCKWÄRTSTRANSPORTS IN VIVO ALS INDEX FÜR ANTI-ARTHEROGENESE | [2008/14] | English: | METHODS FOR MEASURING RATES OF REVERSE CHOLESTEROL TRANSPORT IN VIVO, AS AN INDEX OF ANTI-ATHEROGENESIS | [2008/14] | French: | METHODES PERMETTANT DE MESURER LES TAUX DE TRANSPORT INVERSE DU CHOLESTEROL IN VIVO UTILISES COMME INDICE D'ANTI-ATHEROGENICITE | [2005/26] |
Former [2005/26] | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER GESCHWINDIGKEITEN DES RESERVE-CHOLESTERIN-TRANSPORTS IN VIVO ALS INDEX FÜR ANTI-ARTHEROGENESE | ||
Former [2005/26] | METHODS FOR MEASURING RATES OF RESERVE CHOLESTEROL TRANSPORT IN VIVO, AS AN INDEX OF ANTI-ATHEROGENESIS | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 06.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.11.2008 | CZ | 26.11.2008 | EE | 26.11.2008 | FI | 26.11.2008 | IT | 26.11.2008 | RO | 26.11.2008 | SI | 26.11.2008 | SK | 26.11.2008 | TR | 26.11.2008 | BG | 26.02.2009 | GR | 27.02.2009 | ES | 08.03.2009 | PT | 27.04.2009 | HU | 27.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 26.11.2008 | |
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
IT | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
HU | 27.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CZ | 26.11.2008 | |
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
IT | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 26.11.2008 | |
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 26.11.2008 | |
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 26.11.2008 | |
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 26.11.2008 | |
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | FI | 26.11.2008 | |
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 26.11.2008 | |
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 08.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9320800 (KINNUNEN PAAVO KAI JOHANNES [FI]) [X] 1 * page 8; example -; claim - *; | [X]US5338686 (HELLERSTEIN MARC K [US]) [X] 1-26 * example 6; table 5B *; | [X]WO9513096 (PEPTIDE DELIVERY SYSTEMS PTY L [AU], et al) [X] 1-26 * page 6, line 4 - line 11 *; | [PX]WO03068919 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [PX] 1-26* page 24 - page 25; example 7; claims 1,59 *; | [X] - OUGUERRAM K ET AL, "A new labeling approach using stable isotopes to study in vivo plasma cholesterol metabolism in humans", METABOLISM: CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL 2002 UNITED STATES, (2002), vol. 51, no. 1, ISSN 0026-0495, pages 5 - 11, XP002339483 [X] 1-26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/meta.2002.29006 | [X] - LUTTON C ET AL, "Critical analysis of the use of 14C-acetate for measuring in vivo rat cholesterol synthesis.", REPRODUCTION, NUTRITION, DEVELOPMENT. 1990, (1990), vol. 30, no. 1, ISSN 0926-5287, pages 71 - 84, XP008050735 [X] 26 * abstract * | [X] - BANDSMA R H J ET AL, "The contribution of newly synthesized cholesterol to bile salt synthesis in rats quantified by mass isotopomer distribution analysis", BIOCHIMICA AND BIOPHYSICA ACTA. MOLECULAR AND CELL BIOLOGY OF LIPIDS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000131), vol. 1483, no. 3, ISSN 1388-1981, pages 343 - 351, XP004277311 [X] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1388-1981(99)00192-4 | [X] - SCHEIBNER J ET AL, "Bile acid synthesis from newly synthesized vs. preformed cholesterol precursor pools in the rat.", HEPATOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD.) JUN 1993, (199306), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 0270-9139, pages 1095 - 1102, XP008050733 [X] 1-26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0270-9139(93)90128-A | International search | [A] - BRAVO, E. ET AL., "Decreased Hepatic Uptake and Processing of High Density Lipoprotein Unesterfied Cholesterol and Cholesteryl Ester with Age in the Rat", J. BIOCHEM, (1994), vol. 116, pages 1088 - 1095, XP008042386 | [A] - MAENTAUSTA, O. ET AL., "Radioimmunoassay of Conjugated Cholic Acid, Chenodeoxycholic Acid, and Deoxycholic Acid from Human Serum, with Use of 125I-labeled Ligands", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 264 - 268, XP002983357 | [X] - BROWN, A.S. ET AL., "Treating Patients With Documented Atherosclerosis to National Cholesterol Education Program-Recommended Low-Density-Lipoprotein Cholesterol Goals With Atorvastatin, Fluvastatin, Lovastatin and Simvastatin", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY, (199809), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 665 - 672, XP002983358 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0735-1097(98)00300-3 | [X] - RODA, A. ET AL., "Results with Six "Kit" Radioimmunoassays for Primary Bile Acids in Human Serum Intercompared", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1980), vol. 26, no. 12, pages 1677 - 1682, XP002983359 | [X] - TINT, G.S. ET AL., "Transformation of 5 alpha-cholest-7en-3 beta-ol to cholesterol and cholestanol in cerebrotendinous xanthomatosis", JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, (1974), vol. 15, pages 256 - 261, XP002983360 |