EP1555909 - POWER TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDFINE, Henry, S. 28 Chandler Road Edison, NJ 08820 / US | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2005/30] | Winckels, J.H.F., Mr. Ir., et al Vereenigde, Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03749771.6 | 17.09.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003US29492 | Priority number, date | US20020412292P | 20.09.2002 Original published format: US 412292 P | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004026076 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1555909 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A46B13/02, A61C17/22, A61C17/24, A61C17/32 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
A46B17/08 (EP,US);
A61C17/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61C17/222 (EP,US);
A61C17/26 (KR);
A61C17/34 (KR);
A61C17/3481 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/30] | A46B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE ZAHNBÜRSTE | [2005/30] | English: | POWER TOOTHBRUSH | [2005/30] | French: | BROSSE A DENTS ELECTRIQUE | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 01.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 13.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1532522 (WEAVER JR BENJAMIN F) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US5325560 (PAVONE BERNADINO J [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 18 - line 19 * * column 3, line 27 - line 39 * * figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US5860183 (KAM BING [US]) [Y] 1-16 * column 2, line 38 - line 53 * * column 4 - column 5 * * figures 1-12 *; | [Y]EP0990424 (JOHNS PRODUCTS LTD DR [US]) [Y] 1-16 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 38 * * figures 1-11 * | International search | [Y]US6371294 (BLAUSTEIN LAWRENCE A [US], et al); | [Y]US5325560 (PAVONE BERNADINO J [US], et al); | [Y]US1532522 (WEAVER JR BENJAMIN F) |