EP1558936 - AMPERAGE CONTROL FOR VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technotrans America, Inc. 2181 South Foster Avenue Wheeling, IL 60090 / US | [2005/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGYAR, Robert, J. 972 Wisconsin Lane Elk Grove Village, IL 60007 / US | 02 /
NIEMIRO, Michael, A. 24131 Hampshire Lane Plainfield, IL 60544 / US | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Rutetzki, Andreas, et al Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Rutetzki, Andreas, et al Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/31] | Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria, et al Bugnion S.p.A., Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03749780.7 | 19.09.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003US29659 | Priority number, date | US20020412508P | 20.09.2002 Original published format: US 412508 P | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004027828 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1558936 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/08, H01F5/00, F16K31/02, G05D11/00, B41F7/30 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
F16K31/0675 (EP,US);
B41F7/30 (EP,US);
F16K37/0083 (EP,US);
H01F7/1844 (EP,US);
B41P2200/22 (EP,US);
H01F2007/1866 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/31] | G01R31/08, H01F5/00, F16K31/02, G05D11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [2006/02] |
Former [2005/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMREGELUNG FÜR RÖHREN | [2005/31] | English: | AMPERAGE CONTROL FOR VALVES | [2005/31] | French: | COMMANDE D'AMPERAGE POUR VANNES | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/26] | 10.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3733091 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 7 * abstract * * column 2, line 9 - line 18 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 7 *; | [A]WO0032397 (JIMEK AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - line 15 *; | [X]WO0126817 (SMITH RPM CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 9, line 3 - line 32 * * page 11, line 8 - page 12, line 13 *; | [X]US2002050579 (NEAR TIMOTHY P [US]) [X] 7 * abstract ** paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * | International search | [X]US5523682 (LEON ROBERT L [US]); | [Y]US5578904 (MARCOTT TONY L [US], et al); | [X]US5942892 (LI LONG-JANG [US]); | [XP]US6571823 (ROSSI CARLO [IT], et al) |