EP1510538 - METHOD FOR REUSING CRUSHED SYNTHETIC RESIN PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-96, O-Aza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken 755-8633 / JP | [2010/37] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-96, O-Aza Kogushi Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755-8633 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Yoshiki, Tokyo Head Office, Ube Industr.Ltd 1-2-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8449 / JP | 02 /
AKO, Tatsushi, Sakai Factory, Ube Industries, Ltd 1, Chikko-Shinmachi 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 592-8543 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Yukimasa, Sakai Factory, Ube IndustriesLtd 1, Chikko-Shinmachi 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 592-8543 / JP | 04 /
HINENOYA, Saburou, Sakai Factory, Ube IndustriesLtd 1, Chikko-Shinmachi 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 592-8543 / JP | 05 /
KITA, Yasuo, Sakai Factory, Ube Industries, Ltd 1,Chikko-Shinmachi 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 592-8543 / JP | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/09] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03749813.6 | 11.04.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003JP04651 | Priority number, date | JP20020134288 | 09.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002134288 | JP20020188255 | 27.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002188255 | [2005/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03095531 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510538 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510538 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/20 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
C08J3/201 (EP,US);
C08J3/20 (KR);
B29B7/00 (KR);
C08J11/06 (EP,US);
C08J3/12 (KR);
Y02W30/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | 02.11.2004 | LT | 02.11.2004 | LV | 02.11.2004 | MK | 02.11.2004 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERVERWENDUNG VON ZERKLEINERTEM KUNSTHARZPRODUKT | [2005/09] | English: | METHOD FOR REUSING CRUSHED SYNTHETIC RESIN PRODUCT | [2005/09] | French: | PROCEDE DE REUTILISATION D'UN PRODUIT EN RESINE SYNTHETIQUE BROYE | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2004 | Translation filed | 02.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2010 | BE | 15.09.2010 | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | HU | 15.09.2010 | NL | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SE | 15.09.2010 | SI | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | PT | 17.01.2011 | IE | 11.04.2011 | LU | 11.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 11.04.2011 | ||
LU | 11.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 11.04.2011 | ||
LU | 11.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 11.04.2011 | ||
LU | 11.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 11.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 15.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1195458 (VICKERS ZIMMER AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,10,11 * claims 1,9-11 ** examples 6,7 * | International search | [A]JP2000327896 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD) | by applicant | EP1500673 |