EP1509375 - METHOD FOR SURFACE TREATMENT OF CLAY, CERAMIC OR CEMENTITIOUS ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buildmate A/S Lucernevej 11 Klokkerholm 9320 Hjallerup / DK | [2006/37] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Buildmate A/S Lucernevej 11 Klokkerholm, 9320 Hjallerup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNCH-LAURSEN, Thomas 3L Innovation A/S Vibaekvej 100, Brylle 5690 Tommerup / DK | 02 /
PEDERSEN, Lars Halvorsmindevej 116 Hjoerring 9800 / DK | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Walls, Alan James Alan Walls (IP) Ltd. P.O. Box 223 Tadworth Surrey KT20 5YF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Walls, Alan James Alan Walls (IP) Ltd. P.O. Box 223 Tadworth Surrey KT20 5YF / GB | ||
Former [2005/15] | Walls, Alan James P.O. Box 223 Tadworth, Surrey KT20 5YF / GB | ||
Former [2005/09] | Walls, Alan James K R Bryer & Co., 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03749857.3 | 22.04.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003EP04193 | Priority number, date | GB20020010311 | 07.05.2002 Original published format: GB 0210311 | GB20020028477 | 06.12.2002 Original published format: GB 0228477 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03095168 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1509375 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1509375 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B28B11/08, B28B1/093 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
B28B1/093 (EP,US);
B28B11/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 01.12.2004 | LV | 01.12.2004 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG VON TON-, KERAMIK- ODER ZEMENTGEGENSTÄNDEN | [2005/09] | English: | METHOD FOR SURFACE TREATMENT OF CLAY, CERAMIC OR CEMENTITIOUS ARTICLES | [2005/09] | French: | PROCEDE DESTINE AU TRAITEMENT EN SURFACE D'ARTICLES EN ARGILE, EN CERAMIQUE OU EN CIMENT | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 28.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2006 | CH | 13.09.2006 | CY | 13.09.2006 | EE | 13.09.2006 | FI | 13.09.2006 | LI | 13.09.2006 | RO | 13.09.2006 | SI | 13.09.2006 | SK | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | BG | 13.12.2006 | SE | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | PT | 26.02.2007 | HU | 14.03.2007 | LU | 22.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CY | 13.09.2006 | ||
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
LU | 22.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1309060 (AUSTIN H J) [A] 1-29 * page 1, line 10 - line 14 * * page 1, line 34 - line 59 ** figure 1 *; | [YA]FR2271011 (SERT [FR]) [Y] 19,20,26-28 * page 6, line 6 - line 34 * * figures 8,9 * [A] 1-18,21-25,29; | [XAY]DE4320203 (B & B MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15,21-25 * column 1, line 22 - line 29 * * column 1, line 42 - line 64 * * column 2, line 5 - line 16 * * column 3, line 15 - line 28 * * figure 1 * [A] 16-18,29 [Y] 19,20,26-28 |