EP1501931 - CHIMERIC SNRNA MOLECULES CARRYING ANTISENSE SEQUENCES AGAINST THE SPLICE JUNCTIONS OF THE DYSTROPHIN GENE AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITA' DEGLI STUDI DI ROMA "LA SAPIENZA" Piazzale Aldo Moro 5 00185 Roma / IT | [2009/23] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states UNIVERSITA' DEGLI STUDI DI ROMA "LA SAPIENZA" P.le Aldo Moro 5 00185 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOZZONI, I. Dipt. Genetica e Biologia Molecolare Università Degli Studi di Roma- La Sapienza Piazzale Aldo Moro, 5 I-00185 Roma / IT | 02 /
DE ANGELIS, F.G. Dipt. Genetica e Biologia Molecolare Università Degli Studi di Roma- La Sapienza Piazzale Aldo Moro, 5 I-00185 Roma / IT | [2009/47] |
Former [2005/05] | 01 /
BOZZONI, I. Dipt. Genetica e Biologia Molecolare Università Degli Studi di Roma- La Sapienza Piazzale Aldo Moro, 5 I-00185 Roma / IT | ||
02 /
DE ANGELIS, F.G. Dipt. Genetica e Biol. Molecolare Università Degli Studi di Roma- La Sapienza Piazzale Aldo Moro, 5 I-00185 Roma / IT | Representative(s) | Capasso, Olga, et al De Simone & Partners S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Capasso, Olga, et al de Simone & Partners SpA Via V.Bellini 20 00198 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 03749984.5 | 06.05.2003 | [2005/05] | WO2003IT00273 | Priority number, date | IT2002RM00253 | 08.05.2002 Original published format: IT RM20020253 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03095647 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1501931 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1501931 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, A61K48/00 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C12N2310/111 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE SNRNA MOLEKÜLE MIT ANTISENSE-SEQUENZEN GEGEN DIE "SPLICE JUNCTIONS" DES DYSTROPHIN-GENS UND IHRE THERAPEUTISCHEN VERWENDUNGEN | [2009/19] | English: | CHIMERIC SNRNA MOLECULES CARRYING ANTISENSE SEQUENCES AGAINST THE SPLICE JUNCTIONS OF THE DYSTROPHIN GENE AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC APPLICATIONS | [2005/05] | French: | MOLECULES DE SNARN CHIMERES PORTANT DES SEQUENCES ANTISENS CONTRE LES JONCTIONS D'EPISSAGE DU GENE DE LA DYSTROPHINE ET APPLICATIONS THERAPEUTIQUES ASSOCIEES | [2005/05] |
Former [2005/05] | CHIMERISCHE SNRNA MOLEKÜLE MIT ANTISENSE-SEQUENZEN GEGEN DIE "SPLICE JUNCTIONS" DES DYSTROPHIN-GENS UND IHRE THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 25.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09176221.1 / EP2151497 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | RO | 18.11.2009 | SK | 18.11.2009 | BG | 18.02.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | [2012/42] |
Former [2010/39] | CZ | 18.11.2009 | |
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CZ | 18.11.2009 | |
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | EE | 18.11.2009 | |
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1191097 (LEIDS UNI MEDISCH CT [NL]) [Y] 7-12,15,16 * claims 1-6 *; | [XDY] - GORMAN ET AL., "Restoration of Correct Splicing of Thalassemic ß-Globin Pre-mRNA by modified U1 snRNAs", J BIOL CHEM, (20001117), vol. 275, no. 46, pages 35914 - 35919, XP002261981 [XD] 1-6,13,14 * abstract * * the whole document * [Y] 7-12,15,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M006259200 | [Y] - M. MATSUO, "Duchenne and Becker Muscular Dystrophy: From Gene Diagnosis to Molecular Therapy", IUBMB LIFE, (200203), vol. 53, no. 3, pages 147 - 152, XP009021242 [Y] 7-12,15,16 * Summary; Figure 1; Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/15216540212333 | [Y] - DEUTEKOM VAN J C T ET AL, "Antisense-induced exon skipping restores dystrophin expression in DMD patient derived muscle cells", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (2001), vol. 10, no. 15, ISSN 0964-6906, pages 1547 - 1554, XP002250908 [Y] 7-12,15,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/10.15.1547 | [YD] - MANN C J ET AL, "ANTISENSE-INDUCED EXON SKIPPING AND SYNTHESIS OF DYSTROPHIN IN THE MDX MOUSE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (20010102), vol. 98, no. 1, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 42 - 47, XP001160821 [YD] 7-12,15,16 * abstract * * pages 46-47 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.011408598 | [AD] - SUTER D ET AL, "DOUBLE-TARGET ANTISENSE U7 SNRNAS PROMOTE EFFICIENT SKIPPING OF AN ABERRANT EXON IN THREE HUMAN BETA-THALASSEMIC MUTATIONS", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (199912), vol. 8, ISSN 0964-6906, pages 2415 - 2423, XP000973208 [AD] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/8.13.2415 | [PX] - DE ANGELIS FERNANDA GABRIELLA ET AL, "Chimeric snRNA molecules carrying antisense sequences against the splice junctions of exon 51 of the dystrophin pre-mRNA induce exon skipping and restoration of a dystrophin synthesis in Delta 48-50 DMD cells.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. UNITED STATES 9 JUL 2002, (20020709), vol. 99, no. 14, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9456 - 9461, XP002261982 [PX] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.142302299 | [PX] - BRUN C ET AL, "U7 snRNAs induce correction of mutated dystrophin pre-mRNA by exon skipping.", CMLS CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR LIFE SCIENCES, (200303), vol. 60, no. 3, ISSN 1420-682X, pages 557 - 566, XP009021235 [PX] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s000180300047 |