EP1550270 - GENERALIZED LAYER-2 VPNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St Laurent, Québec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OULD-BRAHIM, Hamid 21 Wynridge Place Kanata, Ontario K2M 2S8 / CA | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Hermele, Daniel Stephen, et al Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Hermele, Daniel Stephen, et al Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03750189.7 | 09.09.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003CA01379 | Priority number, date | US20020410862P | 13.09.2002 Original published format: US 410862 P | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004025904 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1550270 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1550270 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46, H04L29/06 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
H04L69/324 (EP,US);
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04L12/4675 (EP,US);
H04L47/15 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L47/781 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/01] |
Former [2005/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERALLGEMEINERTE LAYER-2 VPN | [2005/27] | English: | GENERALIZED LAYER-2 VPNS | [2005/27] | French: | RESEAUX VPN GENERALISES DE COUCHE 2 | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 16.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP1052810 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [Y] 1,5 * abstract * [A] 2-4,6-8; | [A]WO0078004 (ALCATEL INTERNETWORKING INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 13 * * page 4, line 3 - line 23 ** page 16, line 8 - page 20, line 29 *; | [YA]US2002055989 (STRINGER-CALVERT DAVID W J [US], et al) [Y] 1,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0021] , [0022] , [0024] , [0025] , [0041] * [A] 2-4,6-8 |