EP1542700 - ZOLEDRONIC ACID FOR PREVENTING OR REDUCING SECONDARY FRACTURES AFTER HIP FRACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/25] | METHOD FOR PREVENTING OR REDUCING SECONDARY FRACTURES AFTER HIP FRACTURE | ||
[2011/18] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | For all designated states Lyles, Kenneth W. 1020 Monmouth Avenue Durham, NC 27701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
For all designated states Lyles, Kenneth W. 3515 Cottonwood Drive Durham, NC 27707 / US | |||
Former [2011/21] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
For all designated states Lyles, Kenneth W. 3515 Cottonwood Drive Durham, NC 27707 / US | |||
Former [2006/29] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
For all designated states Lyles, Kenneth W. 3515 Cottonwood Drive Durham, NC 27707 / US | |||
Former [2005/25] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
For all designated states Lyles, Kenneth W. 3515 Cottonwood Drive Durham, NC 27707 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYLES, Kenneth, W. 1020 Monmouth Avenue Durham, NC 27707 / US | 02 /
HOROWITZ, Zebulun, David 83 Blackburn Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | [2012/16] |
Former [2005/25] | 01 /
LYLES, Kenneth, W. 3515 Cottonwood Drive Durham, NC 27707 / US | ||
02 /
HOROWITZ, Zebulun, David 83 Blackburn Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | Representative(s) | Leon, Susanna Iris Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Leon, Susanna Iris Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2005/25] | Leon, Susanna Iris Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 03750546.8 | 15.09.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003EP10239 | Priority number, date | US20020411067P | 16.09.2002 Original published format: US 411067 P | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004024166 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542700 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1542700 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/675, A61P19/00, A61P19/10 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/592 (EP,US);
A61K31/59 (EP,US);
A61K31/663 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K33/06 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/592, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/663, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/06, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/25] | Title | German: | ZOLEDRONSÄURE ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER VERMINDERUNG VON SEKUNDÄRFRAKTUREN NACH HÜFTFRAKTUR | [2011/18] | English: | ZOLEDRONIC ACID FOR PREVENTING OR REDUCING SECONDARY FRACTURES AFTER HIP FRACTURE | [2011/18] | French: | L'ACIDE ZOLEDRONIQUE POUR LA PREVENTION OU LA REDUCTION DE FRACTURES SECONDAIRES CONSECUTIVES A UNE FRACTURE DE LA HANCHE | [2011/18] |
Former [2005/25] | VERWENDUNG VON BIPHOSPHONATEN ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER VERMINDERUNG VON SEKUNDÄRFRAKTUREN NACH HÜFTFRAKTUR | ||
Former [2005/25] | METHOD FOR PREVENTING OR REDUCING SECONDARY FRACTURES AFTER HIP FRACTURE | ||
Former [2005/25] | METHODE DE PREVENTION OU DE REDUCTION DE FRACTURES SECONDAIRES CONSECUTIVES A UNE FRACTURE DE LA HANCHE | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 08.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2005 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2012
06.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group PTC EHF Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjordur / IS Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | 02
07.08.2012
06.12.2012
WITHDRAWN Generics [UK] Limited Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward, et al, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | 03
09.08.2012
16.04.2013
WITHDRAWN Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB Opponent's representative Sant, David Paul Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2012
06.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group PTC EHF Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjordur / IS Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
02
07.08.2012
06.12.2012
WITHDRAWN Generics [UK] Limited Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward, et al, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | |||
03
09.08.2012
16.04.2013
WITHDRAWN Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB Opponent's representative Sant, David Paul Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | |||
Former [2013/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2012
06.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group PTC EHF Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjordur / IS Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
02
07.08.2012
06.12.2012
WITHDRAWN Generics [UK] Limited Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward, et al, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | |||
03
09.08.2012
17.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB Opponent's representative Sant, David Paul Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | |||
Former [2012/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2012
06.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group PTC EHF Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjordur / IS Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
02
07.08.2012
10.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward, et al, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | |||
03
09.08.2012
17.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB Opponent's representative Sant, David Paul Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | |||
Former [2012/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2012
06.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group PTC EHF Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjordur / IS Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
02
07.08.2012
WITHDRAWN Generics [UK] Limited Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward, et al, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | |||
Former [2012/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2012
Actavis Group PTC EHF Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjordur / IS Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | 13.09.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.10.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 20.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 18.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 18.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2003 | CH | 09.11.2011 | CY | 09.11.2011 | CZ | 09.11.2011 | DK | 09.11.2011 | EE | 09.11.2011 | FI | 09.11.2011 | LI | 09.11.2011 | RO | 09.11.2011 | SE | 09.11.2011 | SI | 09.11.2011 | SK | 09.11.2011 | BG | 09.02.2012 | IE | 15.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2022/30] |
Former [2014/20] | CH | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
LI | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | SE | 09.11.2011 | |
SI | 09.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5965547 (GOODSHIP ALLEN E [GB], et al) [A] * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, paragraphs 2,3 ** column 3, line 56 *; | [XA]US6255288 (LOESCHORN CAROL A [GB]) [X] 1-13 * column 1 * * column 2, line 49 - line 65 * * column 8, line 32 * * column 10 * * in particular l. 16/17; 64/65 * * example 2 * * claims 1,5,14 * [A] 14-17; | [XA] - REID IAN R ET AL, "Intravenous zoledronic acid in postmenopausal women with low bone mineral density", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20020228), vol. 346, no. 9, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 653 - 661, XP009021019 [X] 1-13,17 * the whole document * [A] 14-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa011807 | [X] - SOLOMON C G, "Bisphosphonates and osteoporosis", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE 28 FEB 2002 UNITED STATES, (20020228), vol. 346, no. 9, ISSN 0028-4793, page 642, XP009021021 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJM200202283460902 | [A] - NEED ALLAN G ET AL, "Vitamin D status: Effects on parathyroid hormone and 1,25-dihydroxyvitamin D in postmenopausal women", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, (200006), vol. 71, no. 6, ISSN 0002-9165, pages 1577 - 1581, XP002261420 [A] 14-17 * abstract * * Discussion * | Examination | - LYLES, KENNETH W. ET AL, "Zoledronic Acid and Clinical Fractures and Mortality after Hip Fractures", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20071101), vol. 357, no. 18, pages 1799 - 1809 |