EP1554593 - MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SCANNER WITH PRECISELY ALIGNED MAGNETIC FIELD-MODIFYING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMEESTER, Gordon, D. 595 Miner Road Cleveland, OH 44143 / US | 02 /
MORICH, Michael, A. 595 Miner Road Cleveland, OH 44143 / US | 03 /
MCGINLEY, John, V.M. 595 Miner Road Cleveland, OH 44143 / US | 04 /
MULDER, Gerardus, B.J. P.O. Box 220 NL- 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Wolfs, Marc Johannes Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Wolfs, Marc Johannes Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03751119.3 | 15.10.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003IB04537 | Priority number, date | US20020271136 | 15.10.2002 Original published format: US 271136 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004036235 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1554593 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/3873 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
G01R33/3873 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KERNSPINTOMOGRAPH MIT PRÄZISE ANGEORDNETER STRUKTUR ZUR ÄNDERUNG DES MAGNETFELDES | [2005/29] | English: | MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SCANNER WITH PRECISELY ALIGNED MAGNETIC FIELD-MODIFYING STRUCTURE | [2005/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BALAYAGE D'IMAGERIE PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE COMPRENANT UNE STRUCTURE DE MODIFICATION DE CHAMP MAGNETIQUE ALIGNEE DE MANIERE PRECISE | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 21.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0374377 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,16,17,22 * page 2, line 41 - page 3, line 24 * * page 3, line 51 - page 8, line 12 *; | [X]US5418462 (BRENEMAN BRUCE C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-24,26,28 * column 3, line 14 - column 11, line 39 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US5992006 (DATSIKAS THOMAS [US]) [X] 1-3,9,13-24,28 * column 2, line 8 - column 5, line 39 *; | [A] - M. SOUZA ET AL., "OPTIMAL DESIGN OF A SELF SHIELDED MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING MAGNET", JOURNAL DE PHYSIQUE III, (1993), vol. 3, ISSN 1155-4320, pages 2121 - 2132, XP000409328 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1051/jp3:1993265 |