EP1563327 - OPTICAL FILTER AND ELECTRIC LAMP PROVIDED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROERSMA, Rémy, C. c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DREUNING, Hendrik-Jan c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
HENDRIKS, Rene, J. c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Pet, Robert Jacob Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Pet, Robert Jacob Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03751210.0 | 27.10.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003IB04753 | Priority number, date | EP20020079742 | 14.11.2002 Original published format: EP 02079742 | EP20030075078 | 13.01.2003 Original published format: EP 03075078 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004044487 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1563327 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/22, H01J61/40, C09D7/02, C09D183/04, C09B67/00, C03C17/00, F21V9/08 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
C03C17/005 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/007 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/009 (EP,KR,US);
H01J61/35 (EP,KR,US);
C03C2217/485 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHER FILTER UND DAMIT VERSEHENE ELEKTRISCHE LAMPE | [2005/33] | English: | OPTICAL FILTER AND ELECTRIC LAMP PROVIDED THEREWITH | [2005/33] | French: | SUBSTRAT TRANSMETTANT LA LUMIERE DOTE D'UN REVETEMENT ABSORBANT LA LUMIERE, ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN REVETEMENT ABSORBANT LA LUMIERE | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 21.12.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5731091 (SCHMIDT HELMUT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * column 2, line 15 - line 22 * * column 2, line 58 - line 67 * * column 3, line 43 - line 47 * [Y] 3-5,7; | [X]EP1052230 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * example 1 *; | [YA]EP1125998 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [Y] 3-5,7 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] * [A] 1,2,6; | [DYA]WO0120641 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [DY] 3-5,7 * page 2, line 9 - line 14 * * page 3, line 28 - line 30 * * page 4, line 24 - line 30 * * example 1 * [A] 1,2,6 | by applicant | WO0120641 |