EP1552174 - CONNECTOR FOR FLEX SHAFT FOR STRING TRIMMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTD PRODUCTS INC. P.O. Box 368022 Cleveland, OH 44136-9722 / US | [2007/01] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states MTD Products Inc. P.O. Box 368022 Cleveland, OH 44136-9722 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOMBARDO, Fred 1335 W. Remington Drive Chandler, AZ 85248 / US | 02 /
MITCHELL, Michael 10618 S. 159th Street Gilbert, AZ 85234 / US | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03751908.9 | 26.08.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003US26820 | Priority number, date | US20020272383 | 16.10.2002 Original published format: US 272383 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004036075 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1552174 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1552174 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16D1/10, F16C1/08 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
A01D34/416 (EP,US);
F16C1/08 (EP,US);
F16D1/101 (EP,US);
F16D2001/102 (EP,US);
Y10T403/551 (EP,US);
Y10T403/70 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7098 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/06] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG FÜR FADENSCHNEIDER MIT FLEXIBLER WELLE | [2005/28] | English: | CONNECTOR FOR FLEX SHAFT FOR STRING TRIMMER | [2005/28] | French: | CONNECTEUR POUR ARBRE SOUPLE DESTINE A UN TAILLE-BORDURES | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 07.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2376328 (JAEGER [FR]) [A] 1,15* figure - *; | [A]US4416644 (KULISCHENKO WALTER [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * figures 2-4 *; | [X]US4575356 (MUROHUSHI YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * figure 7B *; | [A]EP0411399 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,15 * figure -; claim 5 * |