EP1587725 - ROBOTIC CART PULLING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aethon, Inc. Suite 410, 700 River Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15212 / US | [2013/52] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Aethon, Inc. Suite 410, 700 River Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15212 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THORNE, Henry, F. 145 Hiddon Valley Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15237 / US | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Wheatley, Alison Clare, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2013/52] |
Former [2012/50] | Wheatley, Alison Clare, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2008/04] | Rees, Simon John Lewis, et al Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2005/43] | Vernout, Robert, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03752029.3 | 29.08.2003 | [2005/43] | WO2003US27837 | Priority number, date | US20020407117P | 30.08.2002 Original published format: US 407117 P | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004020267 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1587725 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1587725 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G05D1/02 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
G05D1/0272 (EP,US);
G05D1/0242 (EP,US);
G05D1/0274 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | G06F19/00 | ||
Former IPC [2005/43] | B62D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Title | German: | ROBOTER-WAGENZUGFAHRZEUG | [2005/43] | English: | ROBOTIC CART PULLING VEHICLE | [2005/43] | French: | VEHICULE ROBOT DE TRACTION DE CHARIOT | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 27.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2003 | AT | 25.12.2013 | BE | 25.12.2013 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | ES | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | IT | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | NL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | SE | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | GR | 26.03.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | GB | 29.08.2014 | IE | 29.08.2014 | LU | 29.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | FR | 01.09.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.08.2003 | |
AT | 25.12.2013 | ||
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
GB | 29.08.2014 | ||
IE | 29.08.2014 | ||
LU | 29.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
GB | 29.08.2014 | ||
IE | 29.08.2014 | ||
LU | 29.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
GB | 29.08.2014 | ||
IE | 29.08.2014 | ||
LU | 29.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
GB | 29.08.2014 | ||
IE | 29.08.2014 | ||
LU | 29.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
GB | 29.08.2014 | ||
IE | 29.08.2014 | ||
LU | 29.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
GB | 29.08.2014 | ||
IE | 29.08.2014 | ||
LU | 29.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
GB | 29.08.2014 | ||
LU | 29.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 29.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 29.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 29.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
SE | 25.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6046565 (THORNE HENRY F [US]) [AD] 1-20 * figures 1,6,7 * * column 7, line 7 - line 20 * * column 7, line 28 - line 35 ** column 4, line 19 - line 24 * | International search | [A]US6314341 (KANAYAMA YUTAKA JOHN [US]); | [A]US6385515 (DICKSON MONTE ANDRE [US], et al); | [A]US6445983 (DICKSON MONTE A [US], et al); | [A]US6454036 (AIREY DONALD ROY [US], et al) | by applicant | US4746977 | US4871172 | US5175480 | US5276618 | US5324948 | US5461292 | US5488277 | US5545960 | US5709007 | US5819863 |