EP1546702 - TRANSGENIC CANCER MODELS IN FISH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA-FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE 44 Binney Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2005/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOOK, A., Thomas 315 Haverhill Street North Reading, MA 01864 / US | 02 /
LANGENAU, David, M. 89 Carolina Avenue Jamaica Plain MA 02130 / US | [2006/26] |
Former [2005/26] | 01 /
LOOK, A., Thomas 315 Haverhill Street North Reading, MA 01864 / US | ||
02 /
LANGENAU, David, M. 150 Staniford Street 902 Boston, MA 02114 / US | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03752149.9 | 11.09.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003US28223 | Priority number, date | US20020409585P | 11.09.2002 Original published format: US 409585 P | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004023867 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1546702 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00, A01K67/00, A01K67/027 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
A01K67/0275 (EP,US);
C07K14/82 (EP,US);
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2227/40 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0331 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSGENE KREBSMODELLE IN FISCHEN | [2005/26] | English: | TRANSGENIC CANCER MODELS IN FISH | [2005/26] | French: | MODELISATION DU CANCER A L'AIDE DE POISSONS TRANSGENIQUES | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 01.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/41] | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0140273 (PARKER HUGHES INST [US], et al); | [X] - WINKLER ET AL, "Gene transfer in laboratory fish: model organisms for the analysis of gene function", WINKLER ET AL, HOUDEBINE, LM, Transgenic animals: generation and use, CHUR, SWITZERLAND, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1997), pages 387 - 395, IV, XP002962864 | [Y] - ROUNBEHLER ET AL, "Myc lacks E2F1's ability to suppress skin carcinogenesis", ONCOGENE, (2001), vol. 20, pages 5341 - 5349, XP002978757 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1204691 | [Y] - STEC ET AL, "Modifiable gene expression in mice: kidney-specific deletion of a target gene via the cre-loxP system", EXPERIMENTAL NEPHROLOGY, (199811), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 568 - 575, XP002979038 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000020573 |