EP1549365 - SYRINGE WITH RETRACTABLE NEEDLE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Futura Medical Technologies, Inc. 7301 Ohms Lane, Suite 200 Edina, MN 55439-2331 / US | [2005/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTALVO, Rudy 4635 Gershwin Place Woodland Hills, CA 91364 / US | 02 /
FEITH, Raymond, P. 14731 Ranchview Terrace Chino Hills, CA 91709 / US | 03 /
MCCONNELL-MONTALVO, Susan 4635 Gershwin Place Woodland Hills, CA 91364 / US | 04 /
MARANO-FORD, April 2052 West 11th Street Upland, CA 91786 / US | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Schlee, Alexander Richard, et al Viering, Jentschura & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Schlee, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Viering, Jentschura & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03752443.6 | 16.09.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003US29273 | Priority number, date | US20020247781 | 16.09.2002 Original published format: US 247781 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004024215 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1549365 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
A61M5/3234 (EP,US);
A61M5/00 (KR);
A61M5/178 (KR);
A61M5/315 (KR);
A61M5/32 (KR);
A61M2005/3235 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/01] |
Former [2005/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRITZE MIT EINZIEHBARER NADELANORDNUNG | [2005/27] | English: | SYRINGE WITH RETRACTABLE NEEDLE ASSEMBLY | [2005/27] | French: | SERINGUE POURVUE D'UNE AIGUILLE RETRACTABLE | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 09.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/23] | 23.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2007 | 30.09.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2009 | 30.09.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0347742 (VENTURINI ALDO) [A] 6-8* figures 1-47 *; | [X]US4955870 (RIDDERHEIM KRISTEN A [US], et al) [X] 6-8 * figures 1-9e *; | [X]WO9103269 (TOWNSEND CONTROLS PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 30; figures 1-8 *; | [X]US5114404 (PAXTON GERALD R [US], et al) [X] 6-8 * figures 1A-7 *; | [Y]US5125898 (KAUFHOLD JR HARRY [US], et al) [Y] 6-8 * figures 1-7 *; | [X]FR2673844 (GHERRAK ELIE) [X] 4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US5211628 (MARSHALL JOHN M [US]) [X] 6-8 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]FR2727021 (CHAUVE JEAN YVES [FR]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1a-7 *; | [A]WO9627403 (CLEMENS ANTON H [US], et al) [A] 6-8 * figures 1-7 *; | [X]US6017325 (YERFINO DANIEL ALBERTO [AR], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 33; figures 1-6 *; | [X]WO0018454 (PARKER DAVID WILLIAM [GB], et al) [X] 6-8 * figures 1-7 *; | [X]US6050977 (ADAMS ROBERT D [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 7, line 7 - column 9, line 44; figures 23-37 *; | [Y]US6093171 (HUANG WU-SHUN [TW]) [Y] 4,5 * figures 1-5 *; | [XY]WO0141830 (FUTURA MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 18, line 4 - page 22, line 3; figures 1-21 * [Y] 4-8; | [A]US2002055719 (LO PI-CHANG [TW]) [A] 4,6 * figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]US4863247 (LASHER MARK E [US], et al); | [AP]US6517516 (CAIZZA RICHARD [US]); | [A]US5961491 (MCGARY R KERN [US], et al) |