EP1509259 - APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING AEROSOL FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2009/26] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states AeroGen, Inc. 2071 Stierlin Court Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POWER, John 40 Woodlands Park Galway / IE | 02 /
REGAN, Des Carnaun, Kilrickle Loughrea Co., Galway / IE | 03 /
SMITH, Niall 15 Crescent Green The Crescent, Galway / IE | [2006/20] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
POWER, John 40 Woodlands Park Galway / IE | ||
02 /
REGAN, Des Carnaun, Kilrickle Loughrea Co., Galway / IE | |||
03 /
SMITH, Niall 15 Crescent Green The Crescent / IE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | ||
Former [2005/09] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street St. Ives, Cambridge PE27 5EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 03753105.0 | 20.05.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003US15891 | Priority number, date | US20020382256P | 20.05.2002 Original published format: US 382256 P | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03097126 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1509259 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1509259 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/00, B05B1/08, B05B1/14, A61M11/00, A61M15/00 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
A61M15/0085 (EP,US);
A61M11/005 (EP,US);
B05B17/0646 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | B05B1/00, B05B1/08, B05B1/14, B05B3/04, B05B17/04 | ||
Former IPC [2005/09] | A61M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES AEROSOLS FÜR DIE MEDIZINISCHE BEHANDLUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2005/09] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING AEROSOL FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT AND METHODS | [2005/09] | French: | APPAREIL DE REALISATION D'AEROSOL POUR TRAITEMENT MEDICAL ET PROCEDES CORRESPONDANTS | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 21.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 28.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2003 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | IE | 20.05.2016 | LU | 20.05.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.05.2003 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.05.2003 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 31.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3561444 (EOUCHER RAYMOND MARCEL GUT) [A] 1,8-14* column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 9; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US6014970 (IVRI YEHUDA [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 63; figure 3 *; | [A]WO0015282 (AEROTRON MEDICAL INSTRUMENTATI [IL], et al) [A] 1,4-6 * page 5, line 1 - line 10; figure 1 *; | [Y]FR2802836 (DRAGER MEDIZINTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4-7 * page 9, line 28 - page 11, line 15; figures 4-6 *; | [XY]WO0204055 (AEROGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 3 - line 23; figures 3-8 * [Y] 4-7 | International search | [Y]US5248087 (DRESSLER JOHN LAWRENCE [US]); | [A]US5152456 (ROSS CALVIN J [GB], et al); | [A]US5518179 (HUMBERSTONE VICTOR CAREY [GB], et al); | [A]US5516043 (MANNA RONALD R [US], et al) | by applicant | US5164740 | US5586550 | US5738637 | US6235177 | US5261601 | US6554201 |