EP1540208 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVE TRAIN OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2012 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUGGOLZ, Manfred Robert-Bosch-Strasse 24 71277 Rutesheim / DE | 02 /
HILLENBRAND, Werner In der Wasserstube 23 72639 Neuffen / DE | 03 /
VEIT, Markus Nelkenstrasse 33/1 72124 Pliezhausen / DE | [2005/24] | Application number, filing date | 03753370.0 | 30.08.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003EP09645 | Priority number, date | DE2002143495 | 19.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10243495 | [2005/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004029484 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1540208 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/04, B60K41/08 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
F16H61/0403 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0053 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0216 (EP,US);
F16H2061/161 (EP,US);
F16H63/502 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2006/02] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES ANTRIEBSSTRANGS EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2005/24] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVE TRAIN OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2005/24] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER LA CHAINE CINEMATIQUE D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/39] | 20.08.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.10.2012 | 02.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0676566 (EATON CORP [US]) [DA] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0031442 (VOITH TURBO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 16, line 27 - page 17, line 25 * [Y] 14-19; | [X]US6319170 (HUBBARD GREGORY A [US], et al) [X] 4 * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 15 *; | [Y]WO9817929 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [Y] 14-19 * page 1, line 5 - line 12 * * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 2 * | by applicant | EP0676566 |