EP1543047 - SILICON CONTAINING CYCLOPENTADIENYL RING FOR METALLOCENE CATALYST COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [2005/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAZAVI, Abbas Domaine de la Brisée 35 B-7000 Mons / BE | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Leyder, Francis Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Leyder, Francis Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | ||
Former [2005/25] | Leyder, Francis Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Application number, filing date | 03753463.3 | 24.09.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003EP10713 | Priority number, date | EP20020079065 | 27.09.2002 Original published format: EP 02079065 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004029107 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1543047 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/642, C07F17/00 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/64 (KR);
C07F17/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/65916 (EP,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/659 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/65927 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLOCENKATALYSATORBESTANDTEIL, DER EINEN SILYLGRUPPE-ENTHALTENDEN CYCLOPENTADIENYLRING ENTHÄLT | [2005/25] | English: | SILICON CONTAINING CYCLOPENTADIENYL RING FOR METALLOCENE CATALYST COMPONENTS | [2005/25] | French: | CYCLE CYCLOPENTADIENYLE CONTENANT DU SILICIUM POUR COMPOSANTS DE CATALYSEUR A METALLOCENE | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 29.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.12.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0351392 (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 6 - page 9; examples 1-33 *; | [X]EP0818475 (FINA RESEARCH [BE]) [X] 1-20 * page 7 - page 9; examples 1-14; table 1 *; | [A] - DYSARD, JEFFREY M. ET AL, "Synthesis and Reactivity of.eta.5-Silolyl,.eta.5-Germolyl, and.eta.5-Germole Dianion Complexes of Zirconium and Hafnium", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY (2000), 122(13), 3097-3105, XP001148239 [A] 1-20 * page 3102; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja993563n | [A] - DYSARD, JEFFREY M. ET AL, ".eta.5-Silolyl and.eta.5-Germolyl Complexes of d0 Hafnium. Structural Characterization of an.eta.5-Silolyl Complex", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY (1998), 120(32), 8245-8246, XP001148240 [A] 1-20 * see scheme 1; page 8246 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja9812857 | [DA] - LIU, YUXIA ET AL, "Structure and Chemistry of 1-Silafluorenyl Dianion, Its Derivatives, and an Organosilicon Diradical Dianion", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY (2002), 124(1), 49-57, XP001148238 [DA] 1-20 * page 52; examples 16-18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja011821m |