EP1551280 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A MICRODIALYSIS PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/28] | MICRODIALYSIS PROBE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
[2008/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Disetronic Licensing AG Kirchbergstrasse 190 3401 Burgdorf / CH | [2005/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARR, Matthew 43 Garden Walk Cambridge CB4 3EW / GB | 02 /
REIHL, Bruno Egglirain 14 CH-8832 Wilen bei Wollerau / CH | 03 /
HEINIGER, Hanspeter Hoefliweg 5 CH-4932 Lotzwil / CH | 04 /
JOST, Stefan Brunnweg 24 CH-3203 Mühleberg / CH | [2006/21] |
Former [2005/28] | 01 /
CARR, Matthew 43 Garden Walk Cambridge CB4 3EW / GB | ||
02 /
REIHL, Bruno Egglirain 14 CH-8832 Wilen bei Wollerau / CH | |||
03 /
HEINIGER, Hanspeter Hoefliweg 5 CH-4932 Lotzwil / CH | |||
04 /
JOST, Stefan Huehnerbuehl 47 CH-3065 Bolligen / CH | Representative(s) | Schalch, Rainer, et al c/o E. Blum & Co. Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [2006/49] |
Former [2005/28] | Küng, Peter (CH) Disetronic Medical Systems AG Kirchbergstrasse 190 CH-3401 Burgdorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 03753532.5 | 09.10.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003EP11182 | Priority number, date | DE2002147023 | 09.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10247023 | [2005/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004032735 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1551280 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1551280 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B10/00, A61M25/00 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
A61B5/145 (EP,US);
A61B5/14528 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1002 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MIKRODIALYSESONDE | [2008/24] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A MICRODIALYSIS PROBE | [2008/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN SONDE DE MICRODIALYSE | [2008/24] |
Former [2005/28] | MIKRODIALYSESONDE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2005/28] | MICRODIALYSIS PROBE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
Former [2005/28] | SONDE DE MICRODIALYSE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.11.2008 | CZ | 19.11.2008 | DK | 19.11.2008 | EE | 19.11.2008 | FI | 19.11.2008 | IE | 19.11.2008 | NL | 19.11.2008 | RO | 19.11.2008 | SI | 19.11.2008 | SK | 19.11.2008 | TR | 19.11.2008 | BG | 19.02.2009 | SE | 19.02.2009 | GR | 20.02.2009 | PT | 20.04.2009 | HU | 20.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 19.11.2008 | |
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
HU | 20.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 19.11.2008 | |
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 19.11.2008 | |
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 19.11.2008 | |
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 19.11.2008 | |
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 19.11.2008 | |
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO0010464 (CONNELL MARK THOMAS O [GB]) [X] 1-10,14-17,21 * page 15, paragraph 3 - page 16, paragraph 3; figures 1-11 * * page 15, paragraph 3 - page 16, paragraph 1 * [A] 22-31; | [X]WO0110483 (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13,17-21 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 2; figure 2 *; | [A]US6199262 (MARTIN BRIAN B [US]) [A] 22-31* column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 5; figure 2 *; | [PX]US6478767 (O'CONNELL MARK THOMAS [GB]) [PX] 18 * column 6, line 46 - line 59; figure 11 * |