EP1530753 - METHOD FOR UNIVERSAL CALCULATION APPLIED TO POINTS OF AN ELLIPTIC CURVE DEFINED BY A QUARTIC, RELATED CRYPTOGRAPHIC METHOD AND ELECTRONIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMPLUS La Vigie - Service Brevets, BP 90 13705 La Ciotat Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states Gemplus La Vigie - Service Brevets, BP 90 13705 La Ciotat Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILLET, Olivier 1211, route des Vallettes Sud F-06140 Tourrettes sur Loup / FR | 02 /
JOYE, Marc 19, rue Voltaire F-83640 Saint Zacharie / FR | [2005/20] | Application number, filing date | 03753669.5 | 05.08.2003 | [2005/20] | WO2003FR02462 | Priority number, date | FR20020010193 | 09.08.2002 Original published format: FR 0210193 | [2005/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004017193 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1530753 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/72 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
G06F7/725 (EP,US);
H04L9/003 (EP,US);
H04L9/3066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BERECHNUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR KRYPTOGRAPHIE MITTELS ELLIPTISCHER KURVEN | [2005/20] | English: | METHOD FOR UNIVERSAL CALCULATION APPLIED TO POINTS OF AN ELLIPTIC CURVE DEFINED BY A QUARTIC, RELATED CRYPTOGRAPHIC METHOD AND ELECTRONIC COMPONENT | [2005/20] | French: | PROCEDE DE CALCUL UNIVERSEL APPLIQUE A DES POINTS D'UNE COURBE ELLIPTIQUE | [2005/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 04.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 22.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - CHUDNOVSKY D V ET AL, "SEQUENCES OF NUMBERS GENERATED BY ADDITION IN FORMAL GROUPS AND NEWPRIMALITY AND FACTORIZATION TESTS", ADVANCES IN APPLIED MATHEMATICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (1986), vol. 7, ISSN 0196-8858, pages 385 - 434, XP008000716 [X] 1-14 * page 418, paragraph L - page 424, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0196-8858(86)90023-0 | [AD] - BRIER E ET AL, "WEIERSTRASS ELLIPTIC CURVES AND SIDE-CHANNEL ATTACKS", 5TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON PRACTICE AND THEORY IN PUBLIC KEY CRYPTOSYSTEMS, PKC 2002, PARIS, FRANCE. LNCS 2274, Springer-Verlag, Berlin (DE), (200202), pages 335 - 345, URL: http://link.springer.de/link/service/series/0558/tocs/t2274.htm, (20020205), XP001068195 [AD] 1,10-13 * page 337, line 12 - page 340, line 4 * | [AD] - JOYE M ET AL, "HESSIAN ELLIPTIC CURVES AND SIDE-CHANNEL ATTACKS", CRYPTOGRAPHIC HARDWARE AND EMBEDDED SYSTEMS CHES 2001. THIRD INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, PARIS, FRANCE, MAY 14-16, 2001, PROCEEDINGS. LNCS 2162, (20010514), vol. 2162, ISBN 3-540-42521-7, pages 402 - 410, XP008002643 [AD] 1-10 * page 395, line 8 - page 399, line 21 * | [A] - KHELDOUNI A ET AL, "Elliptic cohomology operation defined by Hecke operator T2", COMPTES RENDUS DES SEANCES DE L'ACADEMIE DES SCIENCES. SERIE I: MATHEMATIQUES, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUES & MEDICALES ELSEVIER, FR, (199701), vol. 324, no. 2, ISSN 0764-4442, pages 215 - 220, XP004269356 [A] 1-14 * page 216, line 12 - line 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0764-4442(99)80348-6 | [T] - P. BARRETO ET AL., "Constructing Elliptic Curves with Prescribed Embedding Degrees", SECURITY IN COMMUNICATION NETWORKS. THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, SCN 2002, AMALFI, ITALY, SEPTEMBER 11-13, 2002. REVISED PAPERS. LNCS 2576, Springer Verlag, Berlin (DE), (2003), pages 257 - 267, URL: http://link.springer.de/link/service/series/0558/papers/2576/25760257.pdf, (20030314), XP002241906 [T] 1-14 * page 259, paragraph L - page 260, paragraph 4 * |