EP1548070 - SURFACE-TREATED CALCIUM CARBONATE AND RESIN COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARUO CALCIUM COMPANY LIMITED 1455, Nishioka, Uozumi-cho Akashi-shi Hyogo 674-0084 / JP | [2018/02] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states MARUO CALCIUM COMPANY LIMITED 1455, Nishioka, Uozumi-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo 674-0084 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Yoichi@c/o Maruo Calcium Company Ltd. 1455 Nishioka, Uozumi-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo 674-0084 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Yuusuke@c/o Maruo Calcium Company Ltd. 1255 Nishioka, Uozumi-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo 674-0084 / JP | 03 /
FUKUMOTO, Katsunori@c/o Maruo Calcium Company Ltd 1455 Nishioka, Uozumi-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo 674-0084 / JP | [2018/02] |
Former [2005/26] | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Yoichi c/o Maruo Calcium Company Ltd. 1455 Nishioka, Uozumi-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo 674-0084 / JP | ||
02 /
HAYASHI, Yuusuke c/o Maruo Calcium Company Ltd. 1255 Nishioka, Uozumi-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo 674-0084 / JP | |||
03 /
FUKUMOTO, Katsunori c/o Maruo Calcium Company Ltd 1455 Nishioka, Uozumi-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo 674-0084 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/02] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/26] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03753999.6 | 03.10.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003JP12710 | Priority number, date | JP20020290860 | 03.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002290860 | [2005/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004031303 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1548070 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1548070 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/02, C09C3/08 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
C09C1/021 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/80 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/02] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTES CALCIUMCARBONAT UND HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIE DAS OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTE CALCIUMCARBONAT UMFASST | [2018/01] | English: | SURFACE-TREATED CALCIUM CARBONATE AND RESIN COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME | [2005/26] | French: | CARBONATE DE CALCIUM TRAITE EN SURFACE ET COMPOSITION A BASE DE RESINE CONTENANT LEDIT CARBONATE DE CALCIUM | [2005/26] |
Former [2005/26] | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTES CALCIUMCARBONAT UND ES ENTHALTENDE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2005 | Translation filed | 28.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.10.2003 | AT | 10.01.2018 | CY | 10.01.2018 | CZ | 10.01.2018 | DK | 10.01.2018 | EE | 10.01.2018 | ES | 10.01.2018 | FI | 10.01.2018 | IT | 10.01.2018 | MC | 10.01.2018 | NL | 10.01.2018 | PT | 10.01.2018 | RO | 10.01.2018 | SE | 10.01.2018 | SI | 10.01.2018 | SK | 10.01.2018 | TR | 10.01.2018 | BG | 10.04.2018 | GR | 11.04.2018 | IE | 03.10.2018 | LU | 03.10.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 03.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 03.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 03.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 03.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 10.01.2018 | |
NL | 10.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0166467 (3P TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-5,23,40,59,60 *; | [X]US2002022084 (CALHOUN ALLISON ANNE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-15,17-28 *; | [X]EP1184420 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0009]; claims 1-7 * | International search | [A]JP2002220547 (MARUO CALCIUM); | [A]JP2001158863 (MARUO CALCIUM); | [A]JPH09169925 (NITTETSU MINING CO LTD) |