EP1553280 - NARROW-ANGLE V-TYPE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YGK Co., Ltd. 2-7-13, Higashi-yamagata, Yamagata-shi Yamagata-ken 990-0022 / JP | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states YGK Co., Ltd. 2-7-13, Higashi-yamagata, Yamagata-shi Yamagata-ken 990-0022 / JP | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states YGK Co., Ltd. 2-25, Sakurada-higashi 3-chome Yamagata-shi, Yamagata 990-2323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Masahiro, c/o YGK Co., Ltd. 2-7-13, Higashi-yamagata Yamagata-shi, Yamagata-ken 990-0022 / JP | [2005/46] |
Former [2005/28] | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Masahiro, c/o YGK Co., Ltd. 2-25, Sakurada-higashi 3-chome Yamagata-shi, Yamagata 990-2323 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03754032.5 | 08.10.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003JP12892 | Priority number, date | JP20020298686 | 11.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002298686 | [2005/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004033883 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1553280 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553280 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F02F1/00, F02B75/22 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
F02B75/221 (EP,US);
F02F1/00 (KR);
F02B75/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/05] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SPITZWINKLIGER V-MOTOR | [2005/28] | English: | NARROW-ANGLE V-TYPE ENGINE | [2005/28] | French: | MOTEUR EN V A OUVERTURE ETROITE | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2005 | Translation filed | 26.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 14.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61218718 ; | [Y]US3626815 (FINGEROOT MAX, et al) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 5 *; | [X]FR2618851 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 5; figures 2,3 *; | [XY] - KRUEGER H, "SECHSZYLINDER-MOTOREN MIT KLEINEM V-WINKEL", MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, VIEWEG, WIESBADEN, DE, (19901001), vol. 51, no. 10, ISSN 0024-8525, pages 410 - 412,414, XP000175192 [X] 1-3,7,8,10 * abstract * [Y] 5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870221), vol. 011, no. 057, Database accession no. (M - 564), & JP61218718 A 19860929 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [A] 7 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS63143332 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPH09250408 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2001200728 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPS62228645 (MAZDA MOTOR) |