EP1571194 - OXONITRIDE PHOSPHOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND LUMINESCENT DEVICE USING THE OXONITRIDE PHOSPHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | ||
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMAKI, Hiroto, c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | 02 /
TAKASHIMA, Suguru, c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | 03 /
KAMESHIMA, Masatoshi, c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | 04 /
NAITOU, Takahiro, c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | [2012/48] |
Former [2005/36] | 01 /
TAMAKI, Hiroto, c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKASHIMA, Suguru, c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | |||
03 /
KAMESHIMA, Masatoshi, c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | |||
04 /
NAITOU, Takahiro, c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, ka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/36] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03754118.2 | 15.10.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003JP13157 | Priority number, date | JP20020301636 | 16.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002301636 | JP20020301637 | 16.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002301637 | JP20020381025 | 27.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002381025 | JP20030028610 | 05.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003028610 | JP20030028611 | 05.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003028611 | JP20030070043 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003070043 | [2005/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004039915 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1571194 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1571194 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/59, C09K11/08, C09K11/62, C09K11/63, C09K11/64, C09K11/65, C09K11/66, C09K11/67, C01B21/082, H01L33/00 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
C09K11/0883 (EP,US);
C09K11/66 (KR);
C09K11/59 (KR);
C09K11/77347 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/45124 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45139 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45169 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48257 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48464 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49107 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/12032 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L33/502 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45139, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45139, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45147, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45169, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Title | German: | OXONITRID-LEUCHTSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG SOWIE AUF DEM OXONITRID-LEUCHTSTOFF BASIERENDE LUMINESZENZVORRICHTUNG | [2005/36] | English: | OXONITRIDE PHOSPHOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND LUMINESCENT DEVICE USING THE OXONITRIDE PHOSPHOR | [2005/36] | French: | OXYNITRURE DE PHOSPHORE, METHODE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANTE ET DISPOSITIF LUMINESCENT UTILISANT L'OXYNITRURE DE PHOSPHORE | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2005 | Translation filed | 13.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 30.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10165443.2 / EP2241607 | EP10165445.7 / EP2241608 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2003 | AT | 12.12.2012 | BE | 12.12.2012 | CY | 12.12.2012 | CZ | 12.12.2012 | DK | 12.12.2012 | EE | 12.12.2012 | FI | 12.12.2012 | IT | 12.12.2012 | MC | 12.12.2012 | NL | 12.12.2012 | RO | 12.12.2012 | SE | 12.12.2012 | SI | 12.12.2012 | SK | 12.12.2012 | TR | 12.12.2012 | BG | 12.03.2013 | GR | 13.03.2013 | ES | 23.03.2013 | PT | 12.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
TR | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 12.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001214162 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP) [X] 1,3,12-14,16,24,25,32 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 25] , [0 28] , [0 35] *; | [XI]US2002043926 (TAKAHASHI YUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,12-14,16,18,32 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 53] , [0 82]; claim 1 * [I] 2; | [E]EP1471583 (NICHIA CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2,12-16,20,32* paragraphs [0046] , [0 52] , [0 53] * | International search | [X]EP0155047 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [X]EP0206389 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [X]EP0206393 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]JP2001214162 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP); | [A]US2002043926 (TAKAHASHI YUJI [JP], et al); | [XP]EP1264873 (NAT INST FOR MATERIALS SCIENCE [JP]); | [XP]JP2003124527 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH); | [XP]JP2003203504 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH); | [XP]JP2003206481 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH); | [XE]JP2004010786 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) | Examination | EP1104799 |