EP1682250 - REGENERATIVE THERMAL OXIDIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR Updated state(s): BE | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | 08.07.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enbion Inc. Kaist Energy Environment Research Center 4102, Kusung-dong, Yusung-gu 305-701 Daejon / KR | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hyun-jae Hyangchon apt. 104-606 970 Dunsan2-dong, Seo-gu 302-776 Daejon / KR | 02 /
YOON, Myeong-soo Yulmaemaul apt. 608-902 Jijok-dong, Yusung-gu 305-330 Daejon / KR | 03 /
CHAE, Myeong-gug 469-94 Bun-dong, Gangbuk-gu 142-060 Seoul / KR | 04 /
LEE, Sang-bock Gubongmaul apt. 902-1601 Gwanjeo-dong 302-723 Daejon / KR | [2014/32] |
Former [2006/30] | 01 /
LEE, Hyun-jae Hyangchon apt. 104-606, 970 Dunsan2-dong, Seo-gu 302-776 Daejon / KR | ||
02 /
YOON, Myeong-soo Yulmaemaul apt. 608-902, Jijok-dong, Yusung-gu 305-330 Daejon / KR | |||
03 /
CHAE, Myeong-gug 469-94 Bun-dong, Gangbuk-gu 142-060 Seoul / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Sang-bock Gubongmaul apt. 902-1601, Gwanjeo-dong 302-723 Daejon / KR | Representative(s) | Maser, Jochen, et al Patentanwälte Mammel & Maser Tilsiter Strasse 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | [2014/32] |
Former [2006/30] | Maser, Jochen, et al Patentanwälte Mammel & Maser, Tilsiter Strasse 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03754261.0 | 23.10.2003 | [2006/30] | WO2003KR02237 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005039741 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1682250 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1682250 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/74 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
F28D19/04 (EP,US);
F23G7/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Title | German: | REGENERATIVE THERMISCHE OXIDATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/13] | English: | REGENERATIVE THERMAL OXIDIZER | [2006/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OXYDATION THERMIQUE A REGENERATION | [2006/30] |
Former [2006/30] | REGENERATIVE THERMOOXIDATIONSVORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2003 | AT | 06.08.2014 | BE | 06.08.2014 | CY | 06.08.2014 | CZ | 06.08.2014 | DK | 06.08.2014 | EE | 06.08.2014 | ES | 06.08.2014 | FI | 06.08.2014 | IT | 06.08.2014 | MC | 06.08.2014 | NL | 06.08.2014 | RO | 06.08.2014 | SE | 06.08.2014 | SI | 06.08.2014 | SK | 06.08.2014 | TR | 06.08.2014 | IE | 23.10.2014 | LU | 23.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | FR | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | BG | 06.11.2014 | GB | 06.11.2014 | GR | 07.11.2014 | PT | 09.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/50] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 23.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GB | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 23.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GB | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 23.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 06.08.2014 | |
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
SE | 06.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4301748 (LTG LUFTTECHNISCHE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 30 - column 7, line 48; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5562442 (WILHELM FREIDRICH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 48 - page 4, line 29; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US6203316 (PENNINGTON RODNEY L [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 45; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1134018 (TRINITY IND CORP [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5562442 (WILHELM FREIDRICH [DE]); | [A]JP2000274644 (TRINITY IND CORP); | [A]JP2000334267 (TRINITY IND CORP); | [A]KR20010044153 (DAE YANG ENVIRONMENT CO LTD [KR]); | [A]EP1145755 (ALSTOM POWER K K [JP]) | by applicant | US5562442 | US6203316 |