EP1558963 - BASE AND AUXILIARY EYEGLASS SYSTEM USING MAGNETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Park, Hun-yang 106/1402, Jeongwhawoobang-Pales APT, 72 Sang-dong Suseong-gu, 706-828 Daegu / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Park, Hun-yang 106/1402, Jeongwhawoobang-Pales APT, 72 Sang-dong Suseong-gu, 706-828 Daegu / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03754263.6 | 23.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003KR02239 | Priority number, date | KR20020065357 | 24.10.2002 Original published format: KR 2002065357 | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004038487 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1558963 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02C9/02 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
G02C9/02 (EP,KR,US);
G02C9/00 (EP,US);
G02C2200/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUPT- UND ZUSATZBRILLENSYSTEM UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MAGNETEN | [2005/31] | English: | BASE AND AUXILIARY EYEGLASS SYSTEM USING MAGNETS | [2005/31] | French: | SYSTEME COMPRENANT DES LUNETTES DE BASE ET DES LUNETTES AUXILIAIRES UTILISANT DES AIMANTS | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 06.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 07.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2007 | 31.10.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0113163 (GENUINE INTERNAT INVEST LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1 * page 3, line 2 - page 5, line 10; figures 1A-4C * [A] 2-14; | [XA]EP1184711 (KU KUO SHENG [TW]) [X] 1,2,5,9,12,13 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1-3 * [A] 3,4,6-8,10,11,14; | [DXA]KR20020023683 (PARK HUN YANG [KR]) [DX] 1,2,4,5,8,9,12 * the whole document * [A] 3,6,7,10,11,13,14; | WO03032052 [ ] (PARK HUN-YANG [KR]) [ ] * page 6, line 10 - page 8, line 8; figures 1-8 * | International search | [X]EP0848276 (CONTOUR OPTIK INC [TW]); | [Y]JP2000075253 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD); | [Y]US5568207 (CHAO RICHARD [TW]) |