EP1536733 - PROSTHETIC VASCULAR GRAFT CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edrich Health Technologies, Inc. 95 Madison Avenue, Suite 120 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [2005/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHARD, Thierry 912 Sterling Drive Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | 02 /
EDOGA, John, K. 10 Franklin Place Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03754436.8 | 03.09.2003 | [2005/23] | WO2003US27544 | Priority number, date | US20020410205P | 12.09.2002 Original published format: US 410205 P | US20030405805 | 02.04.2003 Original published format: US 405805 | [2005/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004023971 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1536733 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1536733 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, A61B17/08 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
A61B17/11 (EP,US);
A61B17/0643 (EP,US);
A61F2/064 (EP,US);
A61B17/12013 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0641 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1107 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1132 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1135 (EP,US);
A61F2002/065 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0062 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/23] | A61B17/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFÄSSPROTHESEN-VERBINDUNGSTEIL | [2005/23] | English: | PROSTHETIC VASCULAR GRAFT CONNECTOR | [2005/23] | French: | CONNECTEUR D'IMPLANT VASCULAIRE | [2005/23] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.12.2009 | BE | 23.12.2009 | CY | 23.12.2009 | CZ | 23.12.2009 | DK | 23.12.2009 | EE | 23.12.2009 | FI | 23.12.2009 | IT | 23.12.2009 | NL | 23.12.2009 | RO | 23.12.2009 | SE | 23.12.2009 | SI | 23.12.2009 | SK | 23.12.2009 | TR | 23.12.2009 | BG | 23.03.2010 | GR | 24.03.2010 | ES | 03.04.2010 | PT | 23.04.2010 | HU | 24.06.2010 | IE | 03.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
IE | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 23.12.2009 | |
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 23.12.2009 | |
SE | 23.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3435823 (EDWARDS MILES LOWELL) [A] 9-13,34,35,38 * column 3, line 4 - line 15; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0218128 (TELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-13,26-38* column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 58; figures 4-6 *; | [YA]FR2683141 (RICHARD THIERRY [FR], et al) [Y] 9-13,34,35 * page 5, line 11 - page 7, line 19; figures 1-3 * [A] 1-8,26-33,36-38; | [A]DE19542733 (MANDLIER MATHIAS [DE]) [A] 1-13,26-38 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6231085 (OLSON DONALD O [US]) [X] 1-8,26-33,36-38 * column 4, line 27 - line 62 * * column 5, line 1 - line 45 * * figures 2-4 * [Y] 9-13,34,35; | [A]WO0226165 (FRANTZEN JOHN J [US]) [A] 1-13,26-38 * page 8, paragraph 6 - page 9, paragraph 2; figures 7-10 * | International search | [A]US4214586 (MERICLE ROBERT W [US]); | [A]US6231085 (OLSON DONALD O [US]); | [AE]US6641177 (PINCIARO JOHN [US]) | by applicant | US3357432 | US3435823 | FR2683141 | US6402767 |