EP1545646 - CATHETER HAVING A COMPLIANT MEMBER CONFIGURED TO REGULATE ASPIRATION RATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gore Enterprise Holdings, Inc. 551 Paper Mill Road Newark, DE 19711 / US | [2006/10] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Arteria Medical Science, Inc. The Presidio, Old Army Headquarters, Building 220, Suite 120, P.O. Box 29450 San Francisco, CA 94129 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOGENDIJK, Michael 125 Gladys Avenue Mountain View CA 94043 / US | [2007/17] |
Former [2005/26] | 01 /
HOGENDIJK, Michael 501 Forest Avenue, 904 Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2005/26] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03754505.0 | 10.09.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003US28603 | Priority number, date | US20020243525 | 12.09.2002 Original published format: US 243525 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004024210 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1545646 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1545646 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
A61M25/00 (EP,US);
A61M5/16813 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0025 (EP,US);
A61M25/0075 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/26] | A61M1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2006/01] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KATHETER MIT NACHGIEBIGEM GLIED ZUR REGULIERUNG DER ASPIRATIONSRATEN | [2005/26] | English: | CATHETER HAVING A COMPLIANT MEMBER CONFIGURED TO REGULATE ASPIRATION RATES | [2005/26] | French: | CATHETER COMPORTANT UN ELEMENT COMPLIANT CONFIGURE POUR LA REGULATION DES VITESSES D'ASPIRATION | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 29.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5085636 (BURNS MATTHEW M [US]) [X] 1,12 * column 3, lines 36-56; figure 1 *; | [X]US5360403 (MISCHE HANS A [US]) [X] 1,12* column 3, lines 23-52; figure - *; | [X]WO0062852 (INTELLA INTERVENTIONAL SYS INC [US]) [X] 1-10,12 * abstract * | International search | [X]US3469582 (JACKSON RICHARD ROBERT); | [X]US5106367 (URECHE ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [X]US5520651 (SUTCU MAZ [US], et al); | [X]US4596563 (PANDE GYAN S [US]); | [Y]US3881483 (SAUSSE ANDRE); | [Y]US3717174 (DEWALL R) | by applicant | US6423032 |