EP1549250 - MEDICAL DEVICES AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael Barbados, West Indies / BB | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDRASEKARAN, Verivada 2433 84th Avenue Southeast Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Karl, Morris 2401 NW 63rd. Apt. 6 Seattle, WA 98107 / US | 03 /
MOLINA, Christopher, Torres 9627 157th Place NE Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Regus Business Center Landsberger Strasse 155 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/27] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03754974.8 | 29.09.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003US30682 | Priority number, date | US20020263212 | 02.10.2002 Original published format: US 263212 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004030578 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1549250 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1549250 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/82 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
C23C8/10 (EP,US);
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61L31/088 (EP,US);
A61L31/18 (EP,US);
C23C14/16 (EP,US);
C23C14/46 (EP,US);
C23C28/00 (EP,US);
C23C28/021 (EP,US);
C23C28/023 (EP,US);
C23C28/028 (EP,US);
C23C28/321 (EP,US);
C23C28/322 (EP,US);
C23C28/325 (EP,US);
C23C28/34 (EP,US);
C23C28/341 (EP,US);
C23C28/345 (EP,US);
C23C28/36 (EP,US);
C23C28/42 (EP,US);
C25D5/48 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91525 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91533 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91566 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91575 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0032 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0098 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12771 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2995 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31544 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31573 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2005/27] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICES AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2005/27] | French: | DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX ET LEURS PROCEDES DE FABRICATION | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08154185.6 / EP1938776 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.04.2008 | BE | 16.04.2008 | CY | 16.04.2008 | CZ | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | EE | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | IT | 16.04.2008 | RO | 16.04.2008 | SI | 16.04.2008 | SK | 16.04.2008 | TR | 16.04.2008 | BG | 16.07.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | ES | 27.07.2008 | PT | 16.09.2008 | GB | 29.09.2008 | LU | 29.09.2008 | CH | 30.09.2008 | LI | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | HU | 17.10.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
TR | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
GB | 29.09.2008 | ||
LU | 29.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
GB | 29.09.2008 | ||
LU | 29.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
GB | 29.09.2008 | ||
LU | 29.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
GB | 29.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 16.04.2008 | |
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 16.04.2008 | |
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 16.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0824900 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [A] 13,24* the whole document *; | [Y]US5824049 (RAGHEB ANTHONY O [US], et al) [Y] 10,11,22,23 * column 6, line 32 - column 14, line 21 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]WO0239927 (IMPLANT SCIENCES CORP [US]) [X] 1-9,12-21,24 * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 2 * * figures 2,3 * [Y] 10,11,22,23 | Examination | WO9902195 | WO0205863 |