EP1423588 - MODULAR REVOLVING CYLINDER ENGINE WITH TANGENTIAL COMBUSTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/23] | MODULAR REVOLVING CYLINDER ENGINE WITH TANGENTIAL SPARKS | ||
[2004/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tagliafero, François Allée des Mimosas 83430 St-Mandrier-sur-Mer / FR | [2004/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/23] | Application number, filing date | 03755215.5 | 28.05.2003 | [2004/23] | WO2003FR01607 | Priority number, date | FR20020006531 | 29.05.2002 Original published format: FR 0206531 | FR20030006455 | 28.05.2003 Original published format: FR 0306455 | [2004/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03100230 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423588 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1423588 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02B53/02, F02B55/00, F02B57/08, F01B13/06, F02B75/32 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
F01B13/06 (EP,US);
F02B57/085 (EP,US);
F01C1/20 (EP,US);
F02B57/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARER ROTATIONSMOTOR MIT TANGENTIALER VERBRENNUNG | [2004/23] | English: | MODULAR REVOLVING CYLINDER ENGINE WITH TANGENTIAL COMBUSTION | [2004/38] | French: | MOTEUR MODULAIRE ROTATIF A EXPLOSIONS TANGENTIELLES | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/23] | MODULAR REVOLVING CYLINDER ENGINE WITH TANGENTIAL SPARKS | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.05.2005 | CZ | 04.05.2005 | EE | 04.05.2005 | FI | 04.05.2005 | IE | 04.05.2005 | IT | 04.05.2005 | NL | 04.05.2005 | RO | 04.05.2005 | SI | 04.05.2005 | SK | 04.05.2005 | TR | 04.05.2005 | CY | 28.05.2005 | LU | 28.05.2005 | BE | 31.05.2005 | FR | 31.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | BG | 04.08.2005 | DK | 04.08.2005 | GR | 04.08.2005 | SE | 04.08.2005 | ES | 15.08.2005 | PT | 17.10.2005 | HU | 05.11.2005 | DE | 01.12.2005 | [2013/46] |
Former [2008/40] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
CZ | 04.05.2005 | ||
EE | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
IT | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
RO | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
SK | 04.05.2005 | ||
TR | 04.05.2005 | ||
CY | 28.05.2005 | ||
LU | 28.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
FR | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
HU | 05.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
CZ | 04.05.2005 | ||
EE | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
IT | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
RO | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
SK | 04.05.2005 | ||
TR | 04.05.2005 | ||
CY | 28.05.2005 | ||
LU | 28.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
HU | 05.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
CZ | 04.05.2005 | ||
EE | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
SK | 04.05.2005 | ||
TR | 04.05.2005 | ||
CY | 28.05.2005 | ||
LU | 28.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
HU | 05.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
CZ | 04.05.2005 | ||
EE | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
SK | 04.05.2005 | ||
TR | 04.05.2005 | ||
CY | 28.05.2005 | ||
LU | 28.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
HU | 05.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
CZ | 04.05.2005 | ||
EE | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
SK | 04.05.2005 | ||
TR | 04.05.2005 | ||
CY | 28.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 04.07.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
HU | 05.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
CZ | 04.05.2005 | ||
EE | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
SK | 04.05.2005 | ||
TR | 04.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 04.07.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
HU | 05.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
CZ | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
SK | 04.05.2005 | ||
TR | 04.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
CZ | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
SK | 04.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
CZ | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
SK | 04.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
CZ | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
GB | 04.05.2005 | ||
SI | 04.05.2005 | ||
BG | 04.08.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 04.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2012834 (BÄHNK) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-6 ** claims 1-15 *; | [X]FR2288863 (MASSAL LOUIS [FR]) [X] 1-10 * figures 1-10 * * claims 1-5 *; | [A]NL7800803 (LEENDERT VAN HUUKSLOOT) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]FR2577987 (MASSAL LOUIS [FR]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-7; claims 1-6 * |