EP1549688 - PROCESS FOR THE COPOLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RESCONI, Luigi Via Arianuova, 56/B I-44100 Ferrara / IT | 02 /
MASCELLANI, Nicoletta Via Pascoli, 4 44012 Bondero / IT | [2006/49] |
Former [2005/27] | 01 /
RESCONI, Luigi Via Arianuova, 56/B I-44100 Ferrara / IT | ||
02 /
MASCELLANI, Nicoletta Via V.Alfieri 16 I-44102 Bondero / IT | Representative(s) | Sacco, Marco Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Privato G. Donegani, 12 Casella Postale 19 44100 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Sacco, Marco Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property P.le G. Donegani, 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | Application number, filing date | 03755555.4 | 10.09.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003EP10107 | Priority number, date | EP20020079195 | 10.10.2002 Original published format: EP 02079195 | US20020418883P | 15.10.2002 Original published format: US 418883 P | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004033510 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1549688 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/16, C08F4/642 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
Y10S526/941 (EP);
Y10S526/943 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/03 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR COPOLYMERISATION VON ETHYLEN | [2005/27] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE COPOLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENE | [2005/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE COPOLYMERISATION D'ETHYLENE | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 10.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9840416 (TARGOR GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 19 - page 23; examples 3-5; table 1 * * claims 2,10 *; | [A]WO0044799 (TARGOR GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-14* page 38 - page 40; examples 3-6 *; | [X]WO0146274 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * claims 1,5 *; | [X]WO0148034 (BASELL POLYPROPYLEN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,13,14 * example 9 * * page 87 - page 88; examples 90-97 * * claims 2,15-23 *; | [X]WO0202575 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * tables 3-5 * * claim 23 * |