EP1529259 - METHOD FOR REPLICATING A SOFTWARE APPLICATION IN A MULTI-COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE, METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT FUNCTIONAL CONTINUITY IMPLEMENTING SAID REPLICATION METHOD, AND MULTI-COMPUTER SYSTEM PROVIDED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2009/26] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states Meiosys Centre Industriel d'Innovation de Basso Cambo, 42, avenue du Général de Croutte 31100 Toulouse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERTES, Marc 57, rue de Terris F-31830 Plaisance du Touch / FR | 02 /
DUFOUR, Laurent 24, rue du Roussillon F-31830 Plaisance du Touch / FR | 03 /
RICHARD, François 2, impasse des Garrabiers F-31120 Lacroix Falgarde / FR | 04 /
KURZ, Gregory 56, route de Tarbes F-31170 Tournefeuille / FR | [2006/49] |
Former [2005/19] | 01 /
VERTES, Marc 57, rue de Terris F-31830 Plaisance du Touch / FR | ||
02 /
DUFOUR, Laurent 3, impasse des Noisetiers F-31830 Plaisance du Touch / FR | |||
03 /
RICHARD, François 2, impasse des Garrabiers F-31120 Lacroix Falgarde / FR | |||
04 /
KURZ, Gregory 56, route de Tarbes F-31170 Tournefeuille / FR | Representative(s) | Therias, Philippe Compagnie IBM France Direction de Propriété Intellectuelle Le Plan-du-Bois 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Therias, Philippe Compagnie IBM France Direction de Propriété Intellectuelle Le Plan-du-Bois 06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [2005/19] | Keib, Gérard Pontet Allano & Associés S.E.L.A.R.L. 6 avenue du Général de Gaulle 78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 03755641.2 | 28.07.2003 | [2005/19] | WO2003FR02371 | Priority number, date | FR20020009855 | 02.08.2002 Original published format: FR 0209855 | [2005/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004015574 | Date: | 19.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1529259 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529259 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
G06F11/2097 (EP,US);
G06F11/2038 (EP,US);
G06F11/2041 (EP,US);
G06F11/2046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERBRECHUNGSFREIER BETRIEB DURCH SOFTWARE-REPLIKATION IN EINER MULTICOMPUTER-ARCHITEKTUR | [2005/19] | English: | METHOD FOR REPLICATING A SOFTWARE APPLICATION IN A MULTI-COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE, METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT FUNCTIONAL CONTINUITY IMPLEMENTING SAID REPLICATION METHOD, AND MULTI-COMPUTER SYSTEM PROVIDED THEREWITH | [2005/19] | French: | CONTINUITE DE FONCTIONNEMENT PAR REPLICATION D'UN LOGICIEL DANS UNE ARCHITECTURE MULTI-ORDINATEURS | [2005/19] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 09.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 04.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.06.2009 | CY | 24.06.2009 | CZ | 24.06.2009 | DK | 24.06.2009 | EE | 24.06.2009 | FI | 24.06.2009 | IE | 24.06.2009 | IT | 24.06.2009 | NL | 24.06.2009 | RO | 24.06.2009 | SI | 24.06.2009 | SK | 24.06.2009 | TR | 24.06.2009 | LU | 28.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | BG | 24.09.2009 | SE | 24.09.2009 | GR | 25.09.2009 | ES | 05.10.2009 | PT | 24.10.2009 | HU | 25.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
IT | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
LU | 28.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
HU | 25.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
IT | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
LU | 28.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
IT | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
FI | 24.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9749039 (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]) [Y] 15 * abstract * * page 11, line 1 - line 17 *; | [XY]US2001008019 (VERT JOHN D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-14,17-20 * page 1, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 9 * * page 3, column L, paragraph 25 - page 4, column L, paragraph 34 * * page 5, column R, paragraph 46 * * page 8, column R, paragraph 65 * * figure 10 * [Y] 5-7,15,16; | [Y] - KAM HONG SHUM, "Fault tolerant cluster computing through replication", PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., 1997 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEOUL, SOUTH KOREA 10-13 DEC. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19971210), ISBN 0-8186-8227-2, pages 756 - 761, XP010267110 [Y] 5,6 * page 756, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 2 * | [Y] - VAYSBURD A, "Fault tolerance in three-tier applications: focusing on the database tier", RELIABLE DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, 1999. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 18TH IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON LAUSANNE, SWITZERLAND 19-22 OCT. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19991019), ISBN 0-7695-0290-3, pages 322 - 327, XP010357037 [Y] 7 * page 323, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RELDIS.1999.805117 | [Y] - MURAKAMI K ET AL, "Design, implementation, and evaluation of highly available distributed call processing systems", FAULT-TOLERANT COMPUTING, 1998. DIGEST OF PAPERS. TWENTY-EIGHTH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MUNICH, GERMANY 23-25 JUNE 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19980623), ISBN 0-8186-8470-4, pages 118 - 127, XP010291284 [Y] 16 * page 118, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FTCS.1998.689461 | [A] - BIN YAO ET AL, "Proxy-based recovery for applications on wireless hand-held devices", RELIABLE DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, 2000. SRDS-2000. PROCEEDINGS THE 19TH IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON NURNBERG, GERMANY 16-18 OCT. 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20001016), ISBN 0-7695-0543-0, pages 2 - 10, XP010523941 [A] 16,20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RELDI.2000.885387 |