EP1551476 - DRUG CARTRIDGE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioject, Inc. 7620 S.W. Bridgeport Road Portland, OR 97224 / US | [2005/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDAU, Sergio 49 South Peak Drive Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Zeitler, Giselher, et al Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 26 02 51 80059 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Zeitler, Giselher, et al Zeitler - Volpert - Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03755762.6 | 28.08.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003US27192 | Priority number, date | US20020272689 | 16.10.2002 Original published format: US 272689 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004035107 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1551476 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1551476 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23P21/00, A61M5/30, A61M5/24 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
A61L2/081 (EP,US);
A61M5/002 (EP,US);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61L2202/24 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2462 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2488 (EP,US);
A61M2005/287 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3104 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3132 (EP,US);
A61M2207/00 (EP,US);
A61M5/1782 (EP,US);
A61M5/2459 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/41] | B23P21/00 | ||
Former IPC [2005/28] | A61M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL-KARTUSCHENANORDNUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2005/28] | English: | DRUG CARTRIDGE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | [2005/28] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE CARTOUCHE POUR MEDICAMENT ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2010 | BE | 15.12.2010 | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | DK | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | FI | 15.12.2010 | HU | 15.12.2010 | NL | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SE | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | TR | 15.12.2010 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | IE | 28.08.2011 | LU | 28.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
TR | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
IE | 28.08.2011 | ||
LU | 28.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
IE | 28.08.2011 | ||
LU | 28.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
IE | 28.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1802529 (PFIZER GMBH) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph L ** figure . *; | [A]US4966581 (LANDAU SERGIO [BR]) [A] 1,5,6,26,27 * column 4, line 10 - line 15 * * column 4, line 30 - line 49 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0174425 (BIOJECT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES I [US], et al) [A] 1-3,14,23,24 * page 13, line 3 - line 14 * * figures 18,19 *; | [A]WO02074406 (PENJET CORP [US]) [A] 1,9-11,15-17 * page 24, line 16 - line 23; figure 4 * * page 27, line 3 - line 5; figure 6 * | International search | [Y]US5009654 (MINSHALL BILLY W [US], et al); | [X]US6065270 (REINHARD MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [A]US6263641 (ODELL ROBERT B [US], et al) |