EP1508859 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE, PAGE DISPLAY METHOD, PROGRAM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Hirotaka, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Naomasa, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2005/08] | Pilch, Adam John Michael D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03756110.7 | 26.05.2003 | [2005/08] | WO2003JP06521 | Priority number, date | JP20020157609 | 30.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002157609 | [2005/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03102787 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508859 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, G06F17/30, G06F3/14, G06F12/00 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
G06F16/955 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/38] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE EINRICHTUNG, SEITENANZEIGEVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2005/08] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE, PAGE DISPLAY METHOD, PROGRAM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2005/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE DE PAGES, PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATION | [2005/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2004 | Translation filed | 28.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 13.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 17.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/17] | 23.01.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.03.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/17] | Appeal following examination | 23.03.2009 | Appeal received No. T1297/09 | 22.05.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.03.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0945811 (ACCESS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0024] - [0028] * * figures 6,8 * * paragraphs [0053] - [0055] *; | [X]WO0155897 (LINK PLUS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 14 * * figure 2 * * figure 5 *; | [X]US2002030697 (OIKAWA TOMOYA [JP]) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0046] * * figures 2,3A-3B,6A-6C *; | [X] - HARDMAN L ET AL, "SMIL 2.0 - Interactive Multimedia on the Web", INTERNET CITATION, (2001), URL: http://homepages.cwi.nl/lynda/tue-2R480/SMILTut.pdf, (20041012), XP002300407 [X] 1-17 * page 55 * * pages 17,31 * * pages 40,43 * * page 15 * | International search | [Y]JPH1040062 (NEC CORP, et al); | [Y]WO9818088 (ACCESS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JPH11296536 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2002055871 (SONY CORP) |