EP1532241 - RATIONALLY DESIGNED POLYSACCHARIDE LYASES DERIVED FROM CHONDROITINASE B [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2010/37] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 17 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POJASEK, Kevin 294 Harvard Street, 2 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
RAMAN, Rahul 144 Pemberton Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
SASISEKHARAN, Ram 2130 Massachusetts Avenue 7B Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | [2007/03] |
Former [2005/21] | 01 /
POJASEK, Kevin 26 Inman Street, 3C Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
02 /
RAMAN, Rahul 144 Pemberton Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
03 /
SASISEKHARAN, Ram 2130 Massachusetts Avenue 7B Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | Representative(s) | Hutter, Anton, et al Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Hutter, Anton, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2005/21] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03756399.6 | 03.06.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003US17680 | Priority number, date | US20020385509P | 03.06.2002 Original published format: US 385509 P | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03102160 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1532241 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1532241 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/88, C12N15/60, A61K38/51 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
C08B37/0069 (EP,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,US);
C12Q1/527 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RATIONELL KONSTRUIERTE, VON CHONDROITINASE B ABGELEITETE LYASEN | [2005/21] | English: | RATIONALLY DESIGNED POLYSACCHARIDE LYASES DERIVED FROM CHONDROITINASE B | [2005/21] | French: | LYASES DE POLYSACCHARIDE DERIVEES DE CHONDROITINASE B, CONCUES DE FACON RATIONNELLE | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 31.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 28.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.11.2009 | 17.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2010 | BE | 15.09.2010 | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | HU | 15.09.2010 | IT | 15.09.2010 | NL | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SE | 15.09.2010 | SI | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | ES | 26.12.2010 | PT | 17.01.2011 | IE | 03.06.2011 | LU | 03.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
LU | 03.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
LU | 03.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
LU | 03.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 15.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - POJASEK K ET AL, "Recombinant expression, purification, and kinetic characterization of chondroitinase AC and chondroitinase B from Flavobacterium heparinum.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS. 17 AUG 2001, (20010817), vol. 286, no. 2, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 343 - 351, XP002348572 [X] 16-27,16-21,22-27 * page 344, column R, paragraph 4 - page 345, column L, line 2 * * figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2001.5380 | [A] - TKALEC ANA LYDIA ET AL, "Isolation and expression in Escherichia coli of cslA and cslB, genes coding for the chondroitin sulfate-degrading enzymes chondroitinase AC and chondroitinase B, respectively, from Flavobacterium heparinum", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200001), vol. 66, no. 1, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 29 - 35, XP002348550 | [A] - GU KENAN ET AL, "Purification, characterization and specificity of chondroitin lyases and glucuronidase from Flavobacterium heparinum", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1995), vol. 312, no. 2, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 569 - 577, XP002348573 | [A] - MASCELLANI GIUSEPPE ET AL, "Structure and contribution to the heparin cofactor II-mediated inhibition of thrombin of naturally oversulphated sequences of dermatan sulphate", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1993), vol. 296, no. 3, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 639 - 648, XP002348574 | [A] - ACHUR RAJESHWARA N ET AL, "Characterization of proteoglycans of human placenta and identification of unique chondroitin sulfate proteoglycans of the intervillous spaces that mediate the adherence of Plasmodium falciparum-infected erythrocytes to the placenta", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20001222), vol. 275, no. 51, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 40344 - 40356, XP002348575 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M006398200 | [A] - PLAAS ANNA H K ET AL, Glycosaminoglycan sulfation in human osteoarthritis: Disease-related alterations at the non-reducing termini of chondroitin and dermatan sulfate, JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, PAGE(S) 12642-12649, (19980515), ISSN 0021-9258, XP002339999 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.20.12642 | [A] - MONAGLE PAUL ET AL, "Covalent heparin cofactor II-heparin and heparin cofactor II-dermatan sulfate complexes: Characterization of novel anticoagulants", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19981211), vol. 273, no. 50, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 33566 - 33571, XP002348576 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.50.33566 | [A] - DAIDOUJI KOUICHI ET AL, "Neoplastic changes in saccharide sequence of dermatan sulfate chains derived from human colon cancer", DIGESTIVE DISEASES AND SCIENCES, (200202), vol. 47, no. 2, ISSN 0163-2116, pages 331 - 337, XP002348577 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1013718021713 | [ ] - "Pedobacter heparinus chondroitinase B precursor (cslB) gene, complete cds.", EMBL, (19951003), Database accession no. CH27584, URL: EBI, XP002348555 | International search | [A]US6093563 (BENNETT D CLARK [CA], et al); | [XP] - POJASEK ET AL, "Biochemical characterization of the chondroitinase B active site", J. BIOL. CHEM., (200208), vol. 277, no. 34, pages 31179 - 31186, XP002978617 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M201552200 | [A] - HAUNG ET AL, "Active site of chondroitin AC lyase revealed by the structure of enzyme-oligosaccharide complexes and mutagenesis", BIOCHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 40, no. 8, pages 2359 - 2372, XP002978618 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi0024254 | [A] - HAUNG ET AL, "Crystal structure of chondroitinase B from Flavobacterium heparinum and its complex with a disaccharide product at 1.7 A resolution", J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 294, pages 1257 - 1269, XP004461802 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1999.3292 | by applicant | - POJASEK, K. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2001), vol. 286, pages 343 - 51 |