EP1543166 - SYNERGISTIC COMPOSITIONS FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ACQUIRED IMMUNODEFICIENCY SYNDROME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2008/43] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Tanox, Inc. 10301 Stella Link Road Houston, TX 77025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNG, Sek, Chung 3511 Deal Street Huston, TX 77025 / US | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03756881.3 | 26.09.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003US30538 | Priority number, date | US20020414062P | 27.09.2002 Original published format: US 414062 P | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004028473 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1543166 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/70, A61K39/395, A61K39/42, A61K38/00, C07K7/00, C07K16/00, C07K17/00, C07K5/00 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K39/39541 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K39/39541, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNERGETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG DES ERWORBENEN IMMUNSCHWÄCHE-SYNDROMS | [2005/25] | English: | SYNERGISTIC COMPOSITIONS FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ACQUIRED IMMUNODEFICIENCY SYNDROME | [2005/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS SYNERGETIQUES POUR LA PREVENTION ET LE TRAITEMENT DU SYNDROME D'IMMUNODEFICIENCE ACQUISE | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 30.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5464933 (BOLOGNESI DANI P [US], et al) [Y] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [X]US5817767 (ALLAWAY GRAHAM P [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * tables 1,2 *; | [DY]US5922325 (TILLEY SHERMAINE A [US], et al) [DY] 1-40* the whole document *; | [Y]US6136310 (HANNA NABIL [US], et al) [Y] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [X] - ALLAWAY G P ET AL, "SYNERGISTIC INHIBITION OF HIV-1 ENVELOPE-MEDIATED CELL FUSION BY CD4-BASED MOLECULES IN COMBINATION WITH ANTIBODIES TO GP 120 OR GP41", AIDS RESEARCH AND HUMAN RETROVIRUSES, MARY ANN LIEBERT, US, (19930101), vol. 9, no. 7, ISSN 0889-2229, pages 581 - 587, XP002927935 [X] 1-40 * the whole document * | [Y] - HINKULA J ET AL, "Enzyme immunoassay (ELISA) for the evaluation of antibodies directed to the CD4 receptor-binding site of the HIV gp120 molecule", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 175, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1759, (19940930), pages 37 - 46, (19940930), XP023986746 [Y] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(94)90329-8 | [Y] - KILBY J M ET AL, "POTENT SUPPRESSION OF HIV-1 REPLICATION IN HUMANS BY T-20, A PEPTIDE INHIBITOR OF GP41-MEDIATED VIRUS ENTRY", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19980101), vol. 4, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 1302 - 1307, XP000909990 [Y] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/3293 | International search | [Y]US5464933 (BOLOGNESI DANI P [US], et al); | [X]US5817767 (ALLAWAY GRAHAM P [US], et al); | [Y]US6136310 (HANNA NABIL [US], et al); | [Y]US2002106371 (BOER MARK DE [NL], et al) |