EP1514452 - HEATABLE GLAZING PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Flat Glass Europe SA Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166 1170 Bruxelles / BE | [2007/43] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states GLAVERBEL Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166 B-1170 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEGAND, Etienne GLAVERBEL - Centre R & D Rue de l'Aurore, 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | 02 /
MEERMAN, Christophe GLAVERBEL - Centre R & D Rue de l'Aurore, 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | 03 /
CATOT, Eddy GLAVERBEL - Centre R & D Rue de l'Aurore, 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Decamps, Alain René François, et al AGC Flat Glass Europe SA Intellectual Property Department - R&D Centre Rue de l'Aurore 2 6040 Jumet / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Decamps, Alain René François, et al AGC Flat Glass Europe SA Intellectual Property Department R&D Centre Rue de l'Aurore, 2 6040 Jumet / BE | ||
Former [2005/11] | Farmer, Guy GLAVERBEL, Department of Intellectual Property, Centre R & D, Rue de l'Aurore 2 6040 Jumet / BE | Application number, filing date | 03757070.2 | 04.06.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003EP50213 | Priority number, date | EP20020077253 | 05.06.2002 Original published format: EP 02077253 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03105533 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1514452 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/84, B64D15/12 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
H05B3/84 (EP,US);
H05B2203/013 (EP,US);
H05B2203/016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH BEHEIZBARE VERGLASUNGSSCHEIBE | [2005/11] | English: | HEATABLE GLAZING PANEL | [2005/11] | French: | VITRE CHAUFFANTE | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2186769 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 1, lines 11-16 * * page 1, lines 43-64 * * page 1, lines 83-130 * * claims 1-7 * * figures 2,11A,12A * [Y] 19,21-29; | [A]GB1051777 (NAPIER & SONS LTD [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 1, lines 9-33 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19860870 (GROS HEIKO [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4251316 (SMALLBONE ROBERT A) [A] 1 * abstract * * claims 1-23 * * columns 4-8 *; | [Y]US5182431 (KOONTZ HARRY S [US], et al) [Y] 19,21-29 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 5, lines 13-31 * * claims 1-3 * |