EP1509833 - SIGNAL TRANSFER METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synaptics (UK) Limited 7340 Cambridge Research Park, Ely Road Waterbeach Cambridgeshire CB5 9TB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Synaptics (UK) Limited 7340 Cambridge Research Park, Ely Road Waterbeach, Cambridgeshire CB5 9TB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELY, David Thomas Eliot, Synaptics (UK) Limited 7340 Cambridge Research Park, Ely Road Waterbeach, Cambridge CB5 9TB / GB | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/09] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford & Co., 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 03757144.5 | 05.06.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003GB02432 | Priority number, date | GB20020012889 | 05.06.2002 Original published format: GB 0212889 | GB20030002298 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: GB 0302298 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03105072 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1509833 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/03, G06F3/033 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
G06F3/046 (EP,US);
G06F3/03545 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG | [2005/09] | English: | SIGNAL TRANSFER METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2005/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRANSFERT DE SIGNAL | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 01.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5693913 (SUDO SHUZO [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,15,17,21,24,26,35 * column 13, line 15 - column 14, line 49; figures 8-11 *[A] 10,36; | [X]WO9858237 (SCIENT GENERICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-10,15,17,24-26,28,34,35,38 * abstract *; | [D]WO0033244 (SYNAPTICS UK LIMITED [GB], et al); | [XA]US2001001430 (ELY DAVID T [GB], et al) [X] 1-10,15,17,21,22,24-27,30,34,35,38 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0083]; claims 12-14,28-30 * [A] 23,36 |