EP1539557 - DOLLY WHEEL STEERING SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEGRATED VISION, INC. 410 S. Pitkin Road Craftsbury Common, VT 05827 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Integrated Vision, Inc. 410 S. Pitkin Road Craftsbury Common, VT 05827 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSSELL, W., Strong 410 S. Pitkin Road Craftsbury Common, VT 05827 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03757289.8 | 28.05.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US16683 | Priority number, date | US20020156466 | 28.05.2002 Original published format: US 156466 | US20020156304 | 28.05.2002 Original published format: US 156304 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03103365 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1539557 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60B33/00, B60B33/02, B62D7/06, B62K5/08 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
B62D7/08 (EP);
B60B33/0005 (EP);
B60B33/0021 (EP);
B60B33/0039 (EP);
B60B33/0049 (EP);
B60B33/0057 (EP);
B60B33/0068 (EP);
B60B33/0073 (EP);
B60B33/025 (EP);
B60B33/026 (EP);
B62D5/0418 (EP);
B62D7/02 (EP);
B62K5/007 (EP);
B62K5/08 (EP);
B62B2301/046 (EP);
B62B2301/0463 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/24] | B62D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHLÄUFERRADLENKSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2005/24] | English: | DOLLY WHEEL STEERING SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE | [2005/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIRECTION DE ROUES SERVANTES D'UN VEHICULE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 25.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/22] | 07.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.07.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 22.07.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.03.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 23.03.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.03.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2009 | 31.05.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2367993 (JOSEPH BISHOP ARTHUR ERNEST) [A] 1-42 * figures 1-14; claims 1-8 *; | [A]US2770832 (CLAUDE MARTIN) [A] 1-42* figures 1-6; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US4667365 (MARTINEK NORMAN A [US]) [A] 1-42 * abstract * * column 5, lines 5-10; claim 1 *; | [A]US6302421 (LEE AARON [US]) [A] 1-42 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5699873 (MORIYA YUKIO [JP], et al); | [A]US6302421 (LEE AARON [US]) | by applicant | US6302421 | US4667365 | US2367993 | US2770832 |