EP1509423 - BUMPER WITH INTEGRATED ENERGY ABSORBER AND BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NetShape Energy Management LLC 1900 Hayes Street, Grand Haven Michigan 49417 / US | For all designated states SHAPE CORPORATION 1900 Hayes Street Grand Haven Michigan 49417 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states NetShape Energy Management LLC 1900 Hayes Street, Grand Haven Michigan 49417 / US | ||
For all designated states SHAPE CORPORATION 1900 Hayes Street Grand Haven, Michigan 49417 / US | |||
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Netshape Corporation 29870 Middlebelt Farmington Hills, MI 48334 / US | ||
For all designated states SHAPE CORPORATION 1900 Hayes Street Grand Haven, Michigan 49417 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Darin 2027 Medina Drive Wixom, MI 48393 / US | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03757371.4 | 06.06.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003US17835 | Priority number, date | US20020163838 | 06.06.2002 Original published format: US 163838 | US20020294124 | 14.11.2002 Original published format: US 294124 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03104030 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1509423 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/18, B60R21/34, B60D1/52 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
B60D1/56 (EP);
B60D1/52 (EP);
B60R19/18 (EP);
B60R19/48 (EP);
B60R19/24 (EP);
B60R2019/1806 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/09] | B60R19/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STOSSFÄNGER MIT INTEGRIERTER ENERGIEAUFNEHMEVORRICHTUNG UND STANGE | [2005/09] | English: | BUMPER WITH INTEGRATED ENERGY ABSORBER AND BEAM | [2005/09] | French: | PARE-CHOCS COMPORTANT UN AMORTISSEUR D'ENERGIE ET UNE POUTRE INTEGRES | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4072334 (SEEGMILLER WAN, et al) [X] 16-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4466646 (DELMASTRO JOHN A [US], et al) [Y] 37* column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 4; figures 2-4 *; | [XY]US4762352 (ENOMOTO KOJI [JP]) [X] 7,8,16-20,31 * the whole document * [Y] 5; | [XY]US5154462 (CARPENTER RONALD A [US]) [X] 16,17 * column 5, lines 7-17; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,21-24,39; | [XY]US5803517 (SHIBUYA AKIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2,9,10,16,17,25,33-36,42,43 * column 3, line 8 - column 6, line 40; figures 1-6 * [Y] 3,5,21-24,37,39 | International search | [A]US4466646 ; | [A]US5984389 ; | [A]US6644699 ; | [A]US6736434 ; | [A]US5358269 ; | [A]US6085954 ; | [A]US6139044 ; | [A]US6474522 |