EP1514345 - QUADRATIC VIDEO DEMODULATION WITH BASEBAND NYQUIST FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RFSTREAM CORPORATION 25 F, Namba Parks Tower, 2-10-70 Namba-naka, Naniwa-ku Osaka 556-0011 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states RFSTREAM CORPORATION 25 F, Namba Parks Tower, 2-10-70 Namba-naka, Naniwa-ku Osaka 556-0011 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMATA, Takatsugu 4032 Davis Street Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 02 /
UTSUNOMIYA, Kimitake 1269 Lakeside Drive, 3110 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Cabinet Hirsch 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03757392.0 | 05.06.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003US17901 | Priority number, date | US20020386472P | 05.06.2002 Original published format: US 386472 P | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03105464 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1514345 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03D3/00 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
H03H11/1213 (EP,US);
H03D3/007 (EP,US);
H03H11/0405 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Title | German: | QUADRATUR-DEMODULATOR UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES BASISBAND-NYQUIST-FILTERS | [2005/11] | English: | QUADRATIC VIDEO DEMODULATION WITH BASEBAND NYQUIST FILTER | [2005/11] | French: | DEMODULATION VIDEO QUADRATIQUE A FILTRE DE NYQUIST PASSE-BAS | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/27] | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6377315 (CARR FRANK [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 25 * * column 11, line 54 - column 12, line 67; figure 5 * * column 16, line 12 - line 27 * * column 27, line 58 - column 28, line 6; figure 19 * * column 37, line 1 - line 21; figure 30 * * column 50, line 17 - column 54, line 22; figures 48-50 *; | [X]US6351293 (PERLOW RANDALL BRET [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5737035 (ROTZOLL ROBERT RUDOLF [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 50 - line 57 * * column 8, line 25 - column 10, line 56; figure 4 *; | [A]US4514763 (RINDAL ABRAHAM E [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0676880 (CABLE TELEVISION LAB INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 39 - column 9, line 30; figure 10 *; | [A]EP0392449 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 22; figure 1 * |