EP1511833 - CLEANING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING DICHLOROETHYLENE AND SIX CARBON ALKOXY SUBSTITUTED PERFLUORO COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyzen Corporation 430 Harding Industrial Drive Nashville Tennessee 37211 / US | [2007/02] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Kyzen Corporation 430 Harding Industrial Drive Nashville, Tennessee 37211 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOYEL, Kyle 430 Harding Industrial Drive Nashville, TN 37211 / US | 02 /
BIXENMAN, Michael 430 Harding Industrial Drive Nasville, TN 37211 / US | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2005/10] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 03757433.2 | 09.06.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003US18089 | Priority number, date | US20020164308 | 07.06.2002 Original published format: US 164308 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03104365 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1511833 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1511833 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C11D7/50 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
C11D7/5018 (EP,KR,US);
C11D7/24 (EP,KR,US);
C11D7/263 (EP,KR,US);
C11D7/264 (EP,KR,US);
C11D7/266 (EP,KR,US);
C11D7/28 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSMITTEL MIT DICHLORETHYLEN UND DURCH ALKOXY SUBSTITUIERTEN PERFLUORVERBINDUNGEN MIT INSGESAMT SECHS KOHLENSTOFFATOMEN | [2005/10] | English: | CLEANING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING DICHLOROETHYLENE AND SIX CARBON ALKOXY SUBSTITUTED PERFLUORO COMPOUNDS | [2005/10] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE NETTOYAGE CONTENANT DES COMPOSES DE DICHLOROETHYLENE ET DE PERFLUORO A SUBSTITUTION ALCOXY C6 | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 21.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2007 | BE | 10.01.2007 | CH | 10.01.2007 | CY | 10.01.2007 | CZ | 10.01.2007 | DK | 10.01.2007 | EE | 10.01.2007 | FI | 10.01.2007 | IT | 10.01.2007 | LI | 10.01.2007 | NL | 10.01.2007 | RO | 10.01.2007 | SI | 10.01.2007 | SK | 10.01.2007 | TR | 10.01.2007 | SE | 10.04.2007 | BG | 11.04.2007 | GR | 11.04.2007 | LU | 09.06.2007 | PT | 11.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | HU | 11.07.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CY | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
EE | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
LU | 09.06.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CY | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
EE | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
EE | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CH | 10.01.2007 | |
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5814595 (FLYNN RICHARD M [US], et al) [DA] 1-7,11,19,30 * example 115; claim - *; | [DA]US5827812 (FLYNN RICHARD M [US], et al) [DA] 1-3,5,6,8-11,19-33* examples 141-156; claim - * | International search | [A]US5925611 (FLYNN RICHARD M [US], et al); | [A]US6274543 (MILBRATH DEAN S [US], et al) |