EP1554819 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG St.-Martin-Strasse 76 81541 Munich / DE | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/38] | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A. St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREY, Thomas Eichhaldenweg 1 89081 Ulm / DE | 02 /
REINHARDT, Markus Eisenhower Str. 23 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | 03 /
SEEGER, Alexander Wittelsbacher Str. 15 85622 Feldkirchen / DE | 04 /
VIERING, Ingo Sintpertstrasse 11 81539 München / DE | 05 /
KIESSLING, Mario Lehle 34 89075 Ulm / DE | 06 /
PURAT, Marcus Zerbster Str. 25 12209 Berlin / DE | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Weidel, Gottfried, et al Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG CEF T&I IPR Patent Administration 80240 Munich / DE | [2013/46] | Application number, filing date | 03757876.2 | 19.09.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003EP10483 | Priority number, date | EP20020023968 | 25.10.2002 Original published format: EP 02023968 | [2005/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004038955 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1554819 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554819 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
H04B7/0634 (EP);
H04B7/0617 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GR, IT, NL [2006/07] |
Former [2005/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DATENÜBERTRAGUNG | [2005/29] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING DATA | [2005/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.09.2013 | NL | 18.09.2013 | FR | 18.11.2013 | GR | 19.12.2013 | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/38] | IT | 18.09.2013 | |
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | NL | 18.09.2013 | |
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | GR | 19.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO0169814 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 1 * page 8, line 1 - page 12, line 25 * * page 24, line 27 - page 26, line 2 * * claim 1.14 * * figures 1,3,5 *[A] 2-13; | [YA]EP1175022 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0028] * * figures 1,3 * [A] 2-13; | [YA]EP1229669 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0126] * * figures 4,7,10,11,15 * [A] 2-13; | [YA] - "UNIVERSAL MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM (UMTS);PHYSICAL LAYER PROCEDURES(FDD) (3GPP TS 25.214 VERSION 3.4.0 RELEASE 1999)", ETSI TS 125 214 V3.4.0, XX, XX, (200009), pages 1 - 48, XP002166612 [Y] 1 * page 31 - page 38 * * figure 3 * [A] 2-13 | Examination | US2002105923 |