EP1558531 - METHOD AND REACTOR FOR DECALCIFYING AND SIMULTANEOUSLY REMOVING HARMFUL SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karimnia, Massoud Brekelbaums Park 5 20537 Hamburg / DE | [2005/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Thomas Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Fleck, Thomas, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Geffckenstrasse 6 20249 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03757920.8 | 07.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003EP11076 | Priority number, date | DE2002147686 | 12.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10247686 | [2005/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004035487 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1558531 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C02F5/02, C02F1/20, C02F1/02 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
C02F5/025 (EP,US);
C02F1/02 (EP,US);
C02F1/20 (EP,US);
C02F1/74 (EP,US);
C02F2301/024 (EP,US);
C02F2303/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND REAKTOR ZUM ENTKALKEN UND GLEICHZEITIGEM ENTFERNEN VON SCHADSTOFFEN | [2005/31] | English: | METHOD AND REACTOR FOR DECALCIFYING AND SIMULTANEOUSLY REMOVING HARMFUL SUBSTANCES | [2005/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET REACTEUR POUR L'ADOUCISSEMENT D'EAU ET L'ELIMINATION SIMULTANEE DE SUBSTANCES POLLUANTES | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 30.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 10.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5858248 (PLESTER GEORGE [BE], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, lines 61-66; figure 1 * * column 4, lines 17-22 * * column 5, lines 21-36 * * column 6, lines 14-18,36-38 *; | [Y]JPH07185521 ; | [XY]US5203286 (YOUSSEF MUSTAFA [CH]) [X] 2 * figure 2 * * column 3, lines 28-40 * * column 5, lines 23-39 * [Y] 1; | [A]US5190668 (CHUANG KARL T [CA]) [A] 1,22 * figure 2; example 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07185521 A 19950725 (KOYO ISHIKAWA) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * |