EP1557471 - METHOD OF PRODUCING POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS WITH YEASTS THROUGH THE INCORPORATION OF OLEFINIC OR ACETYLENIC SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSEJO SUPERIOR DE INVESTIGACIONES CIENTIFICAS C/ Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states CONSEJO SUPERIOR DE INVESTIGACIONES CIENTIFICAS Serrano, 117 28006 Madrid / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMPS DIEZ, F. Inst.de Inv. Quimicas y Ambientales J.P. Vila'(IIQAB) c/J. Girona Salgado18-26 E-080 34 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
RODRIGUEZ ROPERO, S. Inst.de Inv. Quimicas y Amb. J.P. Vila' (IIQAB) c/Jordi Girona Salgado 18-26 E-08034 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
FABRIAS DOMINGO, G. Inst.de Inv. Quimicas y Amb. J.P. Vila' (IIQAB) c/J. Girona saldago 18-26 E-08034 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
PINA CAPO, B. Inst.de Inv. Quimicas y Ambientales J.P. Vila' (IIQAB) c/Jordi GironaSalgado 18-26 E- 08034 Barcelona / ES | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 03758103.0 | 01.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003ES00498 | Priority number, date | ES20020002282 | 04.10.2002 Original published format: ES 200202282 | [2005/30] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004031395 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1557471 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/64, // C12P7/64, C12R1/865 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
C12P7/6427 (EP,US);
C12N1/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PRODUKTION MEHRFACH UNGESÄTIGTERFETTSÄUREN MIT HEFEN ÜBER DEN EINBAU OLEFINISCHER ODER ACETYLENISCHERSUBSTRATE | [2005/30] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS WITH YEASTS THROUGH THE INCORPORATION OF OLEFINIC OR ACETYLENIC SUBSTRATES | [2005/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDES GRAS POLYINSATURES AU MOYEN DE LEVURES PAR INCORPORATION DE SUBSTRATS OLEFINIQUES OU ACETYLENIQUES | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2005 | Translation filed | 28.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/20] | 27.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0175069 ; |