EP1572497 - VEHICLE-MOUNTED EQUIPMENT CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pedrini, Fabio Via Zamboni 1, scala A, piano 1, int. 3 40125 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Pedrini, Fabio Via Zamboni 1, scala A, piano 1, int. 3 40125 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03758436.4 | 28.10.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003IB04773 | Priority number, date | US20020422551P | 31.10.2002 Original published format: US 422551 P | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004039635 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1572497 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/06 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
B60R9/10 (EP,GB,US);
B60R9/06 (EP,GB,US);
B60R9/12 (GB);
Y10S224/924 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGMOTIERTER GERÄTETRÄGER | [2005/37] | English: | VEHICLE-MOUNTED EQUIPMENT CARRIER | [2005/37] | French: | PORTE-EQUIPEMENT MONTE SUR UN VEHICULE | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 25.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/48] | 10.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4452385 (PROSEN GILDO G [US]); | [X]US5971241 (ALLEN ALEXANDER R [US], et al); | [X]US2002096546 (BOGOSLOFSKI KEVIN S [US]); | [X]US2002117524 (JEONG CHANYOUNG [US]) |