EP1563483 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF SELECTIVE ADJUSTMENT OF A COLOR DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genoa Color Technologies Ltd. P.O. Box 12209 Herzliya 46733 / IL | [2013/35] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states Genoa Color Technologies Ltd. P.O. Box 12209 Herzliya 46733 / IL | ||
Former [2006/29] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Genoa Technologies Ltd. P.O. Box 12209 Herzliya 46733 / IL | ||
For:DE
Ben-Chorin, Moshe 34 Ya'kov Street 76251 Rehovot / IL | |||
For:DE
Baruchi, Itay 29 Dubnov Street, Apt. 12 64957 Tel Aviv / IL | |||
Former [2005/33] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Genoa Technologies Ltd. P.O. Box 12209 Herzliya 46733 / IL | ||
For:DE
Ben-Chorin, Moshe 34 Ya'kov Street 76251 Rehovot / IL | |||
For:DE
Baruchi, Itay 29 Dubnov Street, Apt. 12 64957 Tel Aviv / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN-CHORIN, Moshe 34 Ya'kov Street 76262 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
BARUCHI, Itay 29 Dubnov Street Apt. 12 64957 Tel Aviv / IL | [2013/35] |
Former [2005/33] | 01 /
BEN-CHORIN, Moshe 34 Ya'kov Street 76262 Rehovot / IL | ||
02 /
BARUCHI, Itay 29 Dubnov Street, Apt. 12 64957 Tel Aviv / IL | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer UK LLP 15 Old Bailey London EC4M 7EF / GB | ||
Former [2005/33] | Dr. Graf & Partner Intellectual Property, Postfach 518 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 03758643.5 | 02.11.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003IL00905 | Priority number, date | US20020422484P | 31.10.2002 Original published format: US 422484 P | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004040548 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1563483 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1563483 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/67, G09G5/02, H04N1/60 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
H04N1/62 (EP,US);
G09G3/3607 (EP,US);
G09G5/02 (EP,US);
G09G5/06 (EP,US);
H04N1/603 (EP,US);
H04N9/67 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/33] | G09G5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN EINSTELLUNG EINER FARBANZEIGE | [2005/33] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF SELECTIVE ADJUSTMENT OF A COLOR DISPLAY | [2005/33] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE REGLAGE SELECTIF D'UN ECRAN D'AFFICHAGE EN COULEURS | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 24.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.02.2013 | 28.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2006 | 30.11.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2009 | 30.11.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 13.07.2010 | ID: | 02 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 13.07.2010 | [2010/45] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2003 | AT | 28.08.2013 | BE | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | CZ | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | ES | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | IT | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | SE | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | IE | 02.11.2013 | LU | 02.11.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | PT | 30.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 30.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6072464 (OZEKI TORU [JP]); | [X]US6366291 (TANIGUCHI KAZUTAKA [JP], et al) |