EP1525333 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PLASMA IMPLANTATION WITHOUT DEPOSITION OF A LAYER OF BYPRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Varian Semiconductor Equipment Associates Inc. 35 Dory Road Gloucester, MA 01930 / US | [2005/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTHER, Steven, R. 83 Morton Street Andover, MA 01810 / US | 02 /
RADOVANOV, Svetlana, B. 218 Pleasant Street Marblehead, MA 01945 / US | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03759186.4 | 01.08.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003US24158 | Priority number, date | US20020400560P | 02.08.2002 Original published format: US 400560 P | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004013371 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1525333 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C23C8/36, C23C14/48, H01J37/32, H01L21/223 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
C01B21/083 (KR);
C23C14/0057 (KR);
C23C14/0063 (KR);
C23C14/0068 (KR);
C23C14/48 (EP,KR);
C23C14/564 (EP,KR);
H01J37/32412 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/47] |
Former [2005/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PLASMAIMPLANTIERUNG OHNE ABSCHEIDUNG EINER SCHICHT VON NEBENPRODUKTEN | [2005/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PLASMA IMPLANTATION WITHOUT DEPOSITION OF A LAYER OF BYPRODUCT | [2005/17] | French: | ENLEVEMENT PAR PULVERISATION CATHODIQUE AU GAZ DE DILUTION DE COUCHES SUPERFICIELLES DEPOSEES EN PHASE VAPEUR ACTIVEE AU PLASMA | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 31.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/19] | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH11354068 ; | [X]GB2336603 (METALTECH LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1,4,6,7,9 * page 9; example . * * claim - *; | [X]JPH0992804 ; | [X]US5571576 (QIAN LINGQIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,10,17-21,24 * figures 1,2; claim - *; | [X]EP1073087 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,10,11,20,21,24 * paragraphs [0032] - [0040] *; | [X]US4496843 (KIRITA KEI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,10,12-16,20,21,24 * column 2, line 27 - column 4, line 48 *; | [AX]US2001042827 (FANG ZIWEI [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * [X] 17-21,24; | [X]EP1156511 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 20,25 * figure 11 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11354068 A 19991224 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-4,6-9,11,20,21,24 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09092804 A 19970404 (NEC CORP;NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,4,6,20,21,24 * abstract * |