EP1554607 - A METHOD OF RECONSTRUCTING SEISMIC RECORDS TO OBTAIN HIGH RESOLUTION SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paradigm Geophysical Corporation 820 Gessner, Suite 400 Houston, TX 77024 / US | [2013/31] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Paradigm Geophysical Corporation 820 Gessner, Suite 400 Houston, TX 77024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOO, Jason, Chin, Yew 71 Hawkdale Close N.W. Calgary, AB T3G 3A6 / CA | 02 /
DOWNTON, Jonathan, E. 17th Floor 125 - 9th Avenue S.E. Calgary, AB T2G0P6 / CA | 03 /
DEWAR, Janet, Katherine 17th Floor 125 - 9th Avenue S.E. Calgary, AB T2G0P6 / CA | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann, et al Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP 16 Upper Woburn Place London WC1H 0BS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann, et al Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer UK LLP 15 Old Bailey London EC4M 7EF / GB | ||
Former [2009/24] | Chiva, Andrew Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/29] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03759327.4 | 22.09.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003US29619 | Priority number, date | US20020412486P | 20.09.2002 Original published format: US 412486 P | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004027456 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1554607 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554607 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/28 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
G01V1/364 (EP,NO,US);
G01V1/28 (EP,NO,US);
G01V2210/32 (EP,NO,US);
G01V2210/56 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REKONSTRUKTION SEISMISCHER DATENSÄTZE ZUR ERHALTUNG HOCHAUFLÖSENDER SIGNALE | [2013/10] | English: | A METHOD OF RECONSTRUCTING SEISMIC RECORDS TO OBTAIN HIGH RESOLUTION SIGNALS | [2005/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECONSTITUTION D'ENREGISTREMENTS SISMIQUES AFIN D'OBTENIR DES SIGNAUX A RESOLUTION ELEVEE | [2005/29] |
Former [2005/29] | VERFAHREN ZUR REKONSTRUKTION SEISMISCHER DATENSûTZE ZUR ERHALTUNG HOCHAUFL SENDER SIGNALE | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 29.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2009 | 30.09.2010 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   13.01.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 16.08.2012 | ID: | 02 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 16.08.2012 | [2013/01] |
Former [2012/46] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 16.08.2012 | ||
[2013/01] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2003 | AT | 31.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | ES | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | IT | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SE | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | IE | 22.09.2013 | LU | 22.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.09.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 02.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4809238 (BISHOP GLEN W [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 40 - line 49 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 7 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5521881 (LAU YIU-WA A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 1 - line 25 * * column 6, line 27 - line 35 * * claim 1 *; | [A]GB2333364 (GECO AS [NO]) [A] 1-20 * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 8 ** figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]WO02059649 (PGS AMERICAS INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 8, line 11 - line 17 * * page 16, line 28 - page 17, line 16 * * figure 10; claim 33 * | International search | [A]US5971095 (OZBEK ALI [GB]) |