EP1572728 - POLYMER CONJUGATES WITH DECREASED ANTIGENICITY, METHODS OF PREPARATION AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mountain View Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 3475-S Edison Way Menlo Park, CA 94025-1813 / US | [2014/26] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Mountain View Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 3475-S Edison Way Menlo Park, CA 94025-1813 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINEZ, Alexa, L. 1463 Koch lane San Jose, CA 95125 / US | 02 /
SHERMAN, Merry, R. 3455 Brittan Ave. San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 03 /
SAIFER, Mark, G., P. 3455 Brittan Ave. San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 04 /
WILLIAMS, L. David 37709 Arlene Court Fremont, CA 94536 / US | [2013/21] |
Former [2005/37] | 01 /
MARTINEZ, Alexa, L. 1944 Jonathan Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | ||
02 /
SHERMAN, Merry, R. 1114 Royal Lane San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
03 /
SAIFER, Mark, G., P. 1114 Royal Lane San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
04 /
WILLIAMS, L. David 37709 Arlene Court Fremont, CA 94536 / US | Representative(s) | Scheuermann, Erik, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Phoenixbau Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/26] |
Former [2010/44] | Scheuermann, Erik, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Phoenixbau Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/20] | Evenson, Jane Harriet, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/37] | Naylor, Kathryn May, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03759445.4 | 25.09.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US29989 | Priority number, date | US20020414424P | 30.09.2002 Original published format: US 414424 P | US20020317092 | 12.12.2002 Original published format: US 317092 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004030617 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1572728 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1572728 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00, C07K14/475, C07K14/52, C07K14/575, A61K9/127, A61K38/16, A61K38/18, A61K38/22, A61K38/26, A61K38/38, A61K47/48 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
A61K47/646 (EP,BR,KR,US);
C08G65/34 (KR);
A61K31/765 (KR);
A61K38/16 (KR);
A61K38/19 (KR);
A61K47/60 (KR);
A61K9/1271 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/37] | C07K14/00, C07K14/475, C07K14/52, C07K14/575, A61K9/127, A61K38/16, A61K38/18, A61K38/22, A61K38/26, A61K38/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | 29.04.2005 | LT | 29.04.2005 | LV | 29.04.2005 | MK | 29.04.2005 | Title | German: | POLYMER-KONJUGATE MIT VERRINGERTER ANTIGENITÄT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2014/04] | English: | POLYMER CONJUGATES WITH DECREASED ANTIGENICITY, METHODS OF PREPARATION AND USES THEREOF | [2005/37] | French: | CONJUGUÉS DE POLYMÈRES A ANTIGÉNICITÉ RÉDUITE, LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2014/04] |
Former [2005/37] | POLYMER-KONJUGATE MIT VERRINGERTERANTIGENITÄT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UNDVERWENDUNGEN | ||
Former [2005/37] | CONJUGUES DE POLYMERES AVEC ANTIGENICITE REDUITE, PROCEDES DE PREPARATION ET UTILISATIONS DE CES CONJUGUES | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 30.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2013 | 12.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12183751.2 / EP2535347 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | BG | 25.06.2014 | |
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
TR | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 25.06.2014 | |
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | EE | 25.06.2014 | |
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | EE | 25.06.2014 | |
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | EE | 25.06.2014 | |
SK | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4179337 (DAVIS FRANK F [US], et al) [X] 1-13,16-37,39-49,54-61 * the whole document *; | [X] - AKERBLOM E ET AL, "PREPARATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF CONJUGATES OF MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AND STAPHYLOCOCCAL ENTEROTOXIN A USING A NEW HYDROPHILICCROSS-LINKER", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19931101), vol. 4, no. 6, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 455 - 466, XP000608723 [X] 1-13,16-19,30-37,40-49,54-61 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc00024a007 | [X] - KHACHADURIAN A K ET AL, "Polyoxyethylated cholesterol derivatives Organic synthesis, cellular uptake and effect on lipid metabolism in cultured skin fibroblasts", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA - LIPIDS AND LIPID METABOLISM, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 665, no. 3, ISSN 0005-2760, (19810924), pages 434 - 441, (19810924), XP025957198 [X] 1-13,16-19,30-34,40-49,54-61 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2760(81)90256-3 | [X] - ZALIPSKY S ET AL, "Attachment of drugs to polyethylene glycols", EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL, PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD, GB, vol. 19, no. 12, ISSN 0014-3057, (19830101), pages 1177 - 1183, (19830101), XP024053502 [X] 1-13,16-22,30-34,40-49,54-61 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-3057(83)90016-2 | [X] - GHEDINI N ET AL, "Synthesis and partition profiles of nicotinic acid derivatives with oligomeric carriers", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 3, no. 1-4, ISSN 0168-3659, (19860101), pages 185 - 191, (19860101), XP023743725 [X] 1-13,16-19,30-34,40-49,54-61 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(86)90079-9 | [X] - JOHANSSON G ET AL, "Preparation of cibacron blue F3G-A (polyethylene glycol) in large scale for use in affinity partitioning.", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING MAY 1985, (198505), vol. 27, no. 5, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 621 - 625, XP002560712 [X] 1-13,16-34,40-49,54-61 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260270511 | [X] - NAKAMURA T ET AL, "Synthesis of heterobifunctional poly(ethylene glycol) with a reducing monosaccharide residue at one end.", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY 1998 MAR-APR, (199803), vol. 9, no. 2, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 300 - 303, XP002560713 [X] 1-13,16-19,30-34,40-49,54-61 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc970179b | [X] - MARUYAMA K ET AL, "Targetability of novel immunoliposomes modified with amphipathic poly(ethylene glycol)s conjugated at their distal terminals to monoclonal antibodies", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA - BIOMEMBRANES 1995 NL, (1995), vol. 1234, no. 1, ISSN 0005-2736, pages 74 - 80, XP002560714 [X] 1-13,16-19,30-34,40-49,54-61 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2736(94)00263-O | International search | [X]US4917888 (KATRE NANDINI [US], et al); | [Y]US6180134 (ZALIPSKY SAMUEL [US], et al) | Examination | - ABUCHOWSKI A ET AL, "ALTERATION OF IMMUNOLOGICAL PROPERTIES OF BOVINE SERUM ALBUMIN BY COVALENT ATTACHMENT OF POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (19770610), vol. 252, no. 11, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 3578 - 3581, XP000654746 | by applicant | WO8901033 | US4946778 | US5006333 | US5080891 | US5283317 | US5468478 | US5672662 | WO0007629 | WO0159078 | US6576235 | - MORDENTI, J., PHARM RES, (1991), vol. 8, pages 1351 - 1359 | - KUWABARA, T., PHARM RES, (1995), vol. 12, pages 1466 - 1469 |